White v. Clark

Petitioner: Adrian Joe White
Respondent: Ken Clark
Case Number: 1:2009cv00130
Filed: January 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Denying Petitioner's Renewed Motion for Certificate of Appealability 38 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/30/11. (Gonzalez, R)
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/25/2011 disregarding 36 Motion to file additional declaration in support of Notice of Appeal. (Lundstrom, T)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the 9 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DENIED and the Clerk of Court be DIRECTED to Enter Judgment for Respondent, signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Dixon, Jr on 10/1/2010. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 11/4/2010. (Jessen, A)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge William M. Wunderlich on 2/2/2009. (Sondheim, M)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:09-cv-0120 CMK HC) to Fresno 1:09-cv-0130 WMW HC) signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/20/09. (Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adrian Joe White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ken Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?