Wakefield v. Indermill, et al.
Plaintiff: Darryl Wakefield
Defendant: Richard Indermill and CSPC/CDCR
Case Number: 1:2009cv00274
Filed: February 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Granting Defendant's 50 Motion for Summary Judgment; Objections Due within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/21/2011. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 12/27/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DIRECTING Defendant Indermill to RE-SERVE 50 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/12/2011. Fifteen Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/21/11. 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 48 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/22/11: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Discovery (ECF Nos. 35 , 37 , 39 , 40 ), ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motions To Declare Perjury (ECF Nos. 41 , 43 , 44 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/3/2011. (Fahrney, E)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Declare Perjury On Defendant Indermill And Tammy Cano (ECF No. 38 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/2/2011. (Fahrney, E)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting Defendant's Request For Extension Of Time (Doc. 25 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/9/2010. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wakefield v. Indermill, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Indermill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSPC/CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?