Leon et al. vs. United States et al.
Plaintiff: Blanca Leon, Ubertino Leon, Sr., Jesus Leon and Ubertino Leon, Jr.
Defendant: United States of America and Michael James Dunn
Case Number: 1:2009cv00439
Filed: March 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23 U.S.C. ยง 134 P.I.- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/28/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
April 27, 2011 Filing 52 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL ; [Proposed] Order by United States. (Hall, Benjamin)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER AFTER APPROVAL OF MINORS' COMPROMISE signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/29/2011. Filing Deadline: 5/13/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting #44 Motion for Compromise of the Minors' Claims signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/29/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
March 29, 2011 Filing 49 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston: MOTION HEARING re #44 held on 3/29/2011. Court to issue ORDER.Plaintiffs Counsel G. Muir present. Defendants Counsel B. Hall (telephonic) present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
March 28, 2011 Filing 48 EXHIBIT Cost Itemization for Ubertino Leon Jr. re #44 MOTION Compromise of Minors' Claims filed by Blanca Leon. (Muir, Greg)
March 28, 2011 Filing 47 EXHIBIT Cost Itemization for Jesus Leon re #44 MOTION Compromise of Minors' Claims filed by Blanca Leon. (Muir, Greg)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT only) signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/28/2011. Plaintiff's counsel is given notice that the costs itemization, referred to in the motion #44 was not attached. Plaintiffs' counsel must file a copy of the itemization immediately. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
March 15, 2011 Filing 45 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by United States to #44 MOTION Compromise of Minors' Claims. (Hall, Benjamin)
February 23, 2011 Filing 44 MOTION Compromise of Minors' Claims by Blanca Leon. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2011 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 18th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Muir, Greg)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting Extension of Time to file Motion for Minors' Compromisesigned by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/23/2011. Filing Deadline: 3/4/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
February 18, 2011 Filing 42 STATUS REPORT by Blanca Leon, Jesus Leon, Ubertino Leon, Sr, Ubertino Leon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Muir, Greg)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER After Settlement signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/31/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
January 28, 2011 Filing 40 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by United States. (Hall, Benjamin)
January 25, 2011 Filing 39 TRIAL BRIEF by United States.(Hall, Benjamin)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/27/2010. Due to conflicts on the Court's calendar, the pretrial conference and trial will be continued to 2/8/2011 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 18th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The trial will continue on 2/9/2011 and 2/11/2011.(Leon-Guerrero, A)
October 12, 2010 Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT only): The Pretrial Conference is CORRECTED to commence at 9:00 AM on 1/12/2011 in Bakersfield at 1300 18th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT only) as approved by Magistrate Judge Thurston: The Bench Trial is RESET to 1/12/2011 at 09:00 AM, and the Pretrial Conference is RESET to 1/12/2011 at 08:15 AM both in Bakersfield at 1300 18th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT only) as approved by Magistrate Judge Thurston: By request of counsel a Telephonic Status Conference is set for 10/12/2010 at 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Counsel is directed to call the court on a one-line conference call to 661-326-6620. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT only) as approved by Magistrate Judge Thurston: The Bench Trial is advanced from 12/1/2010 to 11/22/2010 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 1300 18th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
June 23, 2010 Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT only) by Deputy Clerk: Due to the unavailability of the Court the Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2010 is ADVANCED to 10/20/2010 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 1200 Truxtun (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/16/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
June 16, 2010 Filing 31 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/16/2010. Court to issue Order. Plaintiffs Counsel G. Muir present. Defendants Counsel B. Hall (telephonic) present. Court Reporter/CD Number: FTR. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Transferring Action; ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/8/2010. Matter transferred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston for all further proceedings; Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 1:09-cv-00439 JLT. Initial Scheduling Conference RESET FOR 6/16/2010 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at Truxtun (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Esteves, C)
May 26, 2010 Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): The matter has been SET FOR Scheduling Conference re pretrial and trial dates on 6/9/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. The parties may appear telephonically by coordinating a conference between counsel prior to calling chambers at 559-499-5960. (Esteves, C)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry): Following an impromptu telephonic conference initiated by this Court's staff, the SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE set 5/26/10 @ 10:30am before Judge Snyder (SMS) #26 is VACATED. Case not ready for meaningful settlement discussions as evidenced by the Confidential Settlement Conference Statements. Judge Austin's chambers to SET a [TELEPHONIC] TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE in the very near future to RE-SET the PRETRIAL and COURT TRIAL dates 27 as there are no pending deadlines dates herein #13 . Signed by Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/25/10. (Robles, F.)
May 20, 2010 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): Due to the consents to magistrate and reassignment of this case, the Pretrial Conference previously set for 6/17/2010 and Trial previously set for 8/2/2010, before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, have been VACATED. An additional scheduling conference will be set by the Court after the 5/26/10 settlement conference. (Esteves, C)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER to Reset Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/7/2010. Settlement Conference RESET for 5/26/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. (Esteves, C)
April 6, 2010 Filing 25 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Reset Settlement Conference by United States. (Hall, Benjamin)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appoint ad Litem for Urbertino Leon Jr. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/8/2009. (Timken, A)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appoint ad Litem for Jesus Leon. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/8/2009. (Timken, A)
September 4, 2009 Filing 22 MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM for Ubertino Leon, Jr. by Blanca Leon. (Muir, Greg)
September 4, 2009 Filing 21 MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM for Jesus Leon, minor by Blanca Leon. (Muir, Greg)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ASSIGNING CASE Re Presiding Judge, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/19/2009. All Future Pleadings Shall Be Numbered As Follows: 1:09-cv-439-GSA.(Scrivner, E)
June 19, 2009 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): Pursuant to the #18 Stipulation and Order Regarding Non-Jury Trial, the hearing set for August 7, 2009, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin HAS BEEN VACATED. (Esteves, C)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Stipulation and ORDER Regarding Non-Jury Trial signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/18/2009. (Esteves, C)
June 18, 2009 Filing 17 CONSENT to JURISDICTION by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by United States. (Hall, Benjamin)
June 18, 2009 Filing 16 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Non-Jury Trial by United States. (Hall, Benjamin)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): In light of the congested trial calendar maintained by the district judge, it is important for purposes of maintaining this Courts docket that the matter be specifically identified as either calendared for a jury trial or a court trial. Given the parties current positions on the matter, the Court elects to set the matter for briefing and oral argument on the issue. Plaintiffs shall file a brief in support of their position that they are entitled to a jury trial, no later than July 17, 2009. Defendant shall file a brief in support of its position that Plaintiffs are not so entitled pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2402, no later than July 31, 2009. The matter will be argued on August 7, 2009, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. In the event the parties come to some agreement on the issue, a stipulation can be filed with the Court and the limited briefing and related hearing mentioned above will be vacated - signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/18/2009. (Esteves, C)
June 17, 2009 Filing 14 CONSENT to JURISDICTION by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Blanca Leon, Ubertino Leon, Sr, Jesus Leon, Ubertino Leon, Jr. (Muir, Greg)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/16/2009. Expert Disclosure: December 18, 2009; Supplemental Expert Disclosure: January 8, 2010; Nonexpert Discovery Cutoff: March 12, 2010; Expert Discovery Cutoff: April 16, 2010; Pretrial Motion Filing Deadline: April 30, 2010; Pretrial Motion Hearing Deadline: June 3, 2010; Settlement Conference set for 4/13/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin; Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4(LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Trial set for 8/2/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4(LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Esteves, C)
June 16, 2009 Filing 12 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin: INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE HELD on 6/16/2009 - Scheduling Order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel Greg A. Muir present. Defendants Counsel Benjamin Hall present. (Esteves, C)
June 9, 2009 Filing 11 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by United States. (Hall, Benjamin)
May 29, 2009 Filing 10 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by United States. Attorney Hall, Benjamin E. added.(Hall, Benjamin)
April 6, 2009 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Blanca Leon, Ubertino Leon, Sr, Jesus Leon, Ubertino Leon, Jr. United States served on 3/30/2009, answer due 5/29/2009. (Muir, Greg)
April 3, 2009 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Blanca Leon, Ubertino Leon, Sr, Jesus Leon, Ubertino Leon, Jr. Michael James Dunn served on 3/26/2009, answer due 4/15/2009. (Muir, Greg)
March 9, 2009 Filing 7 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Forms, #3 VDRP Forms) (Figueroa, O)
March 9, 2009 Filing 6 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Michael James Dunn* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Greg A. Muir* *1800 30th Street, 4th Floor* *1800 30th Street, 4th Floor*. (Figueroa, O)
March 9, 2009 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Greg A. Muir* *1800 30th Street, 4th Floor* *Bakersfield, CA 93301*. (Figueroa, O)
March 9, 2009 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Michael James Dunn* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Greg A. Muir* *1800 30th Street, 4th Floor* *Bakersfield, CA 93301*. (Figueroa, O)
March 9, 2009 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against all defendants by BLANCA LEON, UBERTINO SR. LEON, JESUS LEON, UBERTINO JR. LEON.(Muir, Greg)
March 9, 2009 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by BLANCA LEON, UBERTINO SR. LEON, JESUS LEON, UBERTINO JR. LEON (Muir, Greg)
March 9, 2009 RECEIPT number #CAE100006255 $350.00 fbo Blanca Leon by Greg A Muir on 3/9/2009. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leon et al. vs. United States et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Leon
Represented By: Gregory Andrew Muir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ubertino Leon, Sr.
Represented By: Gregory Andrew Muir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Leon
Represented By: Gregory Andrew Muir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ubertino Leon, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory Andrew Muir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Benjamin E. Hall, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael James Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?