Manriquez v. Huchins et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Manriquez
Defendant: J. Huchins, J. Reynoso, M. Hacker, R. Roberson, C. Munoz, D. Daley, P Perez, Paz, C. Morse and Omos
Case Number: 1:2009cv00456
Filed: March 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER Closing Case in Light of Unopposed 378 Request to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/02/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/28/14 ordering that within 14 days from the date of this order, defendants shall show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for their failure to comply with this court's 09/10/14 order. (Plummer, M)(cc: KJN) Modified on 10/28/2014 (Plummer, M).
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/09/14 ordering that within 30 days from the date of this order, defendants shall file a status report as set forth above. (cc: KJN) (Plummer, M) Modified on 9/10/2014 (Plummer, M).
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/24/14 ordering plaintiff's motions 362 , 364 , 365 are denied without prejudice. Within 30 days from the date of this order, defendants shall file a status report regarding completion of the settlement herein; plaintiff's objections, if any, may be filed 21 days thereafter. (cc: KJN) (Plummer, M)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 360 Request for Assistance to Obtain Agreement/Contract for Signing and Payment as Moot; ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's 362 Request for Judicial Intervention/Assistance re: Settlement Contract, and Request for Conference Call, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/19/2014. (Marrujo, C)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 355 Request for Order DIRECTING the Clerk to Return Fees; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Return Witness Fees (Docs. 348 & 353 ) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/3/2014. (Marrujo, C)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER Recalling Witness Fees and Service of Subpoenas on Witnesses by the United States Marshal signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/31/2014. (Flores, E)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER Directing Service of Subpoenas on Witnesses by The United States Marshal Without Prepayment of Costs, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/26/14. Service Within 7 Days. (Gonzalez, R)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion Seeking a Subpoena for Witness Michael Torres to Secure His Attendance at Trial 289 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/12/14. (Hellings, J)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Daniel Manriquez, CDC#K-78581, and His Legal Property, on March 31, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom #25, at the U. S. District Court, 501 I. Street, Sacramento, CA 95814 before Judge Kendall J. Newman, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/4/2014. (Marrujo, C)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 287 Motion for Attendance of Unincarcerated Witnesses who Refuse to Testify Voluntarily; ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 309 Motion for Two-Week Extension of Time to Pay Fees for Attendance of Unincarcerated Witnesses at Trial signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 02/202014. Witness Fees due by 3/13/2014. (Flores, E)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER to Address Assignment to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all Purposes signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 02/18/2014. (Flores, E)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER Vacating Settlement Conference and Discharging Second Amended Order & Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 02/19/2014. (Flores, E)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 290 AMENDED ORDER Setting Settlement Conference and Requiring Parties to Submit Confidential Settlement Conference Statements Directly to Chambers signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 01/13/2014. Settlement Statement due by 2/12/2014. Settlement Conference set for 2/19/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Flores, E)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM for Video Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/19/2013. (Marrujo, C)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER REQUIRING Parties to Notify Court Whether a Settlement Conference Would Be Beneficial TWENTY-DAY DEADLINE, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/12/13. (Hellings, J)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER Partially Granting Defendants' 256 Motion for Clarification of One Aspect of Court's Order Granting and Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and Request for Sanctions, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/25/2013. (Marrujo, C)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER Adopting 247 Findings and Recommendations Recommending Denying Plaintiff's 191 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/1/13. (Verduzco, M)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER REQUIRING Defendants to Reply to Plaintiff's Request for Clarification 250 FIFTEEN-DAY DEADLINE, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/18/12. (Hellings, J)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 235 Motion to Enforce the Discovery Order and Imposing Sanctions; ORDER DISREGARDING Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion Requesting the Court Enforce the Discovery Order (Doc. 240 ); ORDER DENYI NG Plaintiff's Verified Response to Declaration of Robert Murphy (Doc. 237 ); ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 225 Motion for Appointment of Experts at Defendant's Expense; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk's Office to Serve a Copy of This Order on the Supervising Attorney General, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/21/2012. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 247 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice be DENIED, Plaintiff's Request to Supplement His Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED and 191 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment be DENIED re 174 Second Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/19/2012. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER STRIKING Defendants' 202 Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, 203 Declaration of Defendant Hacker, and 204 Statement of Disputed Facts, and 205 Response and Plaintiff's 216 Evidentiary Objections to Defendants' Evidence, 217 Declaration in Support, and 218 Opposition to Defendants' Objections signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/31/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 137 ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Relief From Order Denying Disclosure of Videos (ECF No. 226 , 231 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/29/12. (Hellings, J)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Subpoenas (ECF No. 238 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/28/2012. (Fahrney, E)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 207 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/18/2012. (Flores, E)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER Granting First Motion to Extend Time to File Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment 213 ; ORDER Disregarding Plaintiff's Letter 214 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/11/12. Thirty Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER Addressing 200 Motion for Clarification and Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/23/12. (Verduzco, M)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER Addressing Statement of Discovery Needed (Docs. 184 & 187 ); ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's 189 Reply to Response to Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/4/2012. Motion to Compel Due Within Sixty Days. (Marrujo, C)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER Directing Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Statement of Discovery Needed signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/02/2012. Response due by 4/9/2012. (Flores, E)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Sixth, Seventh, Eighth, and Ninth Motions to Compel and Motion for Determination of the Sufficiency of Defendants Reynoso and Munoz' Objections to Request for Admissions re 97 , 99 , 163 , 164 & 165 ; ORDER E XTENDING Discovery Cut-Off Deadline Nunc Pro Tunc to November 15, 2011 130 ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Preserve Evidence and Motion for an Extension of the Discovery Cut-Off Date re 154 & 166 ; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of the Dispositive Motion Deadline re 170 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/12/2012. Dispositive Motion Deadline: May 1, 2012. (Marrujo, C)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER ADOPTING Findings and Recommendations and DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants 173 , 179 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/11/12: This action shall proceed on the second amended complaint, filed November 22, 2011; Defendants Perez, Daley, Langler and Henrichsen are dismissed, with prejudice; This action is referred back to the Magistrate Judge. (Hellings, J)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/9/2012. Show Cause Response due by 1/30/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 173 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissing Certain Claims And Defendants, ORDER Directing Clerk Of The Court To File The Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 162 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/15/2011. F&R's referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 1/20/2012.(Fahrney, E)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 151 Motion for Appointment of Expert Witnesses signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/25/2011. (Flores, E)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 143 Motion to File Amended Complaint and Withdraw Previously Filed Amended Complaint and Ordering Clerk's Office to File First Amended Complaint; ORDER Withdrawing Plaintiff's 66 68 69 Motion to Amend Complaint, Motion for Removal of Exhibits from Complaint, Motion to Supplement Paragraph, Amended Complaint and Supplemental Paragraph signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/19/2011. (Flores, E)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER denying 132 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/5/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/1/2011 denying 54 Motion for Stay of briefing schedule and denying 64 Motion for Extension of time on discovery schedule as moot. (Amended Pleading Deadline: 9/15/2011, Amended Discovery Deadline 11/15/2011, Amended Dispositive Motions Deadline 1/13/2012). (Lundstrom, T)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Denying 125 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 07/12/2011. (Flores, E)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER REQUIRING Defendants to File Response to Plaintiff's Sixth Motion to Compel 54 , 64 , 65 , 97 , 99 , (THIRTY DAY DEADLINE) signed by Magistrate Judge Snyder on 7/5/11. (Hellings, J)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Denying 43 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/14/2010. (Flores, E)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER ADOPTING In Full 36 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; GRANTING In Part and DENYING In Part 16 Motion to Dismiss: Plaintiffs claims against Defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED AND this action will proceed on Plaintiffs Eight h Amendment claims against Defendants in their individual/personal capacities; DENYING 20 Motion for Verification of Pending Deadline in which to File his Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; DENYING 39 Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiffs claims for declaratory relief are DISMISSED; Defendants motion for a more definite statement is DENIED, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/2/2010. (Marrujo, C)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 ; Objections Due Within 30 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/13/2010. It is HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Defendants motion to dismiss, filed on December 7, 2009, should be PARTIALLY GRANTED and PARTIALLY DENIED. Referred to Judge Oliver W. Wanger. Objections to F&R due by 8/16/2010. (Bradley, A)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Re Defendant's Failure to Respond to the Court's Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/5/2010. Show Cause Response due by 4/7/2010.(Sant Agata, S)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING 14 Ex Parte Application to Extend Time to File Initial Responsive Pleading; 30-Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/5/2009. Filing Deadline: 12/7/2009.(Bradley, A)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying Motion For Court Order (Doc. 12 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/13/2009. (Scrivner, E)
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FINDING SERVICE of Complaint Appropriate and Forwarding Documents to Plaintiff, Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/21/2009. Service is Appropriate for C. Morse, Omos, J. Huchins, J. Reynoso, Clausings, M. Hacker, R. Roberson, C. Mu noz, D. Daley, R. Perez, Paz. Clerk to Send Plaintiff: 11 Summons, 11 USM-285 Forms, 1 Notice of Submission of Documents Form and Instruction Sheet and 1 Copy of the Complaint 1 Filed on March 11, 2009. Notice of Submission of Documents and Completed Service Packet due by 8/24/2009. (Arellano, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manriquez v. Huchins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Manriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Huchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Reynoso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?