Olvera v. Adams
Petitioner: Cain Mora Olvera
Respondent: Deral G. Adams
Case Number: 1:2009cv00620
Filed: March 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendation, Dismissing Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus with Prejudice as Untimely, and Declining to Issue Certificate of Appealability 27 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/22/2010. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that the 18 MOTION to DISMISS be GRANTED and the habeas corpus petition be DISMISSED with prejudice for Petitioners failure to comply with 28 U.S.C. § 2244(d)s one year limitation period, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/26/2010, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 9/30/2010. (Marrujo, C)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge William M. Wunderlich on 4/16/2009. (Figueroa, O)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:09-cv-869 DAD P) to Fresno (1:09-cv-0620 WMW HC) signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/6/09. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olvera v. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cain Mora Olvera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deral G. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?