December 18, 2013 |
Filing
206
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/18/13 ordering plaintiff's 11/06/13 motion 203 is denied without prejudice. (cc: KJN) (Plummer, M)
|
October 25, 2013 |
Filing
202
ORDER DISMISSING Acrion With Prejudice 201 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/25/13: Pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal, this action is DISMISSED in its entirety with prejudice. Each side to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
|
October 23, 2013 |
Filing
200
ORDER Denying Request For Appointment Of Counsel As Moot (ECF No. 195 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/23/2013. (Fahrney, E)
|
October 17, 2013 |
Filing
199
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/17/2013 ORDERING that plaintiff's 193 , 195 motions to cancel the settlement agreement are DENIED; and within 30 days, plaintiff shall: (a) sign and return to counsel for defendants the documents required to complete settlement of this action; and (b) file a statement with the court confirming that he has signed and mailed the signed settlement documents to defendants. (cc: KJN) (Yin, K)
|
August 23, 2013 |
Filing
198
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/23/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff is directed to file, within 21 days, a statement as to whether he still wishes to contest the settlement and, if so, on what grounds; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a copy of the May 6, 2013 settlement transcript (ECF No. 197 ).(Dillon, M)
|
August 5, 2013 |
Filing
196
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/05/13 ordering the undersigned will address the pending motion to cancel the settlement agreement once the court reviews the transcript from the settlement placed on the court record. (Plummer, M)(cc: KJN) Modified on 8/5/2013 (Plummer, M).
|
April 11, 2013 |
Filing
189
ORDER Referring Case to Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/10/2013. Confidential Settlement Statements due by 4/29/2013; Settlement Conference set for 5/6/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman.(Flores, E)
|
March 25, 2013 |
Filing
188
AMENDED SECOND SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/22/2013. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 6/6/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe; Jury Trial set for 7/23/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe.(Flores, E)
|
March 18, 2013 |
Filing
187
ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 184 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/18/13: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
|
January 7, 2013 |
Filing
178
ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Granting Defendant Zamora's Motion For Summary Judgment (ECF No. 175 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/7/2013. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant Zamora and against Plaintiff Patrick Dunkel. This action is now proceeding against Defendants Garcia, Robaina, Dileo and Mackey for deliberate indifference in violation of the Eighth Amendment. (Fahrney, E)
|
November 19, 2012 |
Filing
175
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Granting Defendant Zamora's 163 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/16/2012. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 12/26/2012. (Flores, E)
|
August 29, 2012 |
Filing
174
ORDER ADOPTING 162 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Granting in Part Defendants' 137 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER Granting 148 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Surreply, Denying Plaintiff's 149 Motion to File a Surreply from the Record; ORDER Granting Defendant Zamora the Opportunity to File a Motion for Summary Judgment Nunc Pro Tunc to June 13, 2012, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 08/29/2012. (Flores, E)
|
July 13, 2012 |
Filing
169
ORDER Permitting Plaintiff Opportunity To File Supplemental Opposition And Granting Thirty Days To File Opposition In Light Of Separately-Issued Summary Judgment Notice (ECF Nos. 137 , 163 ), Thirty-Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/12/2012. (Responses due by 8/16/2012) (Fahrney, E)
|
May 23, 2012 |
Filing
162
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending 137 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted in Part and Denied in Part, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/23/12. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections due within thirty days. (Verduzco, M)
|
May 21, 2012 |
Filing
161
ORDER ADOPTING 151 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 130 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/21/2012. (Flores, E)
|
March 7, 2012 |
Filing
151
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants Dill, Garcia, Mendoza, Pfeiffer and Zamoras' 130 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/07/2012. Objections to F&R due by 4/9/2012. (Flores, E)
|
September 29, 2011 |
Filing
127
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 125 Motion for Reconsideration and DENYING Plaintiff's 124 Motion to Compel Production signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/29/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
|
September 7, 2011 |
Filing
122
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's 109 Motion to Compel; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 119 Motion for Leave to File a Motion to Compel; ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's 121 Motion for Sixty Day Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/6/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
|
June 15, 2011 |
Filing
111
ORDER Directing Re-Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum by United States Marshals Service without Prepayment of Costs signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 06/13/2011. (Flores, E)
|
May 27, 2011 |
Filing
104
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motions to Compel 87 , 90 ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Subpoenas 98 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/26/11. (Hellings, J)
|
May 26, 2011 |
Filing
103
ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to Provide Date of Birth for Records Request 101 ; FIFTEEN-DAY DEADLINE, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/25/11: Plaintiff shall send requested in information directly to Judge Snyder's chambers marked confidential. (Hellings, J)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing
101
ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING 85 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum and DIRECTING Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum by United States Marshals service without prepayment of costs, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 05/11/2011.Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Distribute Data Program System Unit for the in and out log is DENIED; Issuance to Corcoran District Hospital, Colonial Medical Group, CHW Central California Mercy Hospital and U.C. Davis Medical Center is GRANTED and should be sent to USM Sacramento for service along with attached letter, (1) USM 285 Form and (1) copy of this order plus a copy for Marshals Service. (Martin, S)
|
April 5, 2011 |
Filing
96
ORDER Granting First 95 Motion to Extend Time to Object to Defendants' Objections to Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/4/2011. 30-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
|
March 17, 2011 |
Filing
93
ORDER Denying Motion Requesting Leave to Amend 71 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/16/11. (Verduzco, M)
|
March 15, 2011 |
Filing
91
ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations 86 , and Denying Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Injunction; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 42 45 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/15/11. (Verduzco, M)
|
February 7, 2011 |
Filing
86
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denial of Motions 42 , 46 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/4/11. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 3/10/2011.(Verduzco, M)
|
November 2, 2010 |
Filing
76
ORDER denying 56 , 70 Motions to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/1/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
|
September 21, 2010 |
Filing
61
ORDER Denying Motions 27 , 37 , 39 , 46 , 51 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/21/2010. (Verduzco, M)
|
September 15, 2010 |
Filing
54
ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations 50 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/14/2010. (Verduzco, M)
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing
50
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That Defendant's 20 Motion to Dismiss be Denied; Objections Due Within 30 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/28/2010. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 8/30/2010. (Bradley, A)
|
April 19, 2010 |
Filing
29
ORDER Denying 26 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/19/2010. (Flores, E)
|
January 15, 2010 |
Filing
17
ORDER Denying 16 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 01/15/2010. (Flores, E)
|
December 18, 2009 |
Filing
13
ORDER Finding Service of Complaint Appropriate, and Forwarding Service Documents to Plaintiff for Completion and Return Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/17/09: Service is appropriate for Defendants Garcia, Mend oza, Araich, Mackey, Robaina, Dileo, Dill Pfeiffer, Ali and Zamora; Clerk to send plaintiff: (10) Summons, (10) USM-285 Forms, and (1) copies of the Amended Complaint filed on October 8, 2009. (Submission of Service Documents deadline: 1/20/2010) (Hellings, J)
|
December 15, 2009 |
Filing
12
ORDER Dismissing Certain Claims, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/14/2009. (Sondheim, M)
|
November 16, 2009 |
Filing
11
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/13/2009. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the October 9, 2009, 9 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. (Bradley, A)
|
October 9, 2009 |
Filing
9
**DISCHARGED Pursuant to 11 Order** ORDER to SHOW CAUSE, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/8/09: Show Cause Response due by 11/12/2009; Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order will result in a dismissal of this action pursuant to Local Rule 11-110.(Hellings, J)
|