[GSA] Munoz et al v. Giumarra Vineyards Corporation
Plaintiff: Rafael Munoz, Lidia Cruz and Yanet Hernandez
Defendant: Giumarra Vineyards Corporation
Case Number: 1:2009cv00703
Filed: April 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 29:1801 Farmworker Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Final Approval of the Class Settlement and Granting in Part the Requests for Class Representative Fees, Attorneys Fees and Costs, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/20/2017. Referred to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER GRANTING APPROVAL OF THE FINALIZED CLASS NOTICE PACKET (Doc. 224 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/3/2017. (Kusamura, W)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER GRANTING 217 the Parties' Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/24/2017. Final Approval and Fairness Hearing set for 6/20/2017 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE and ORDER Requiring Filing of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement by March 3, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/30/2016. Status Conference CONTINUED to 1/13/2017 at 08:45 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Joint status report due by 1/6/2017. Motion filing deadline 3/3/2017. (Hall, S)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER ADOPTING Fingings and Recommendations, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/30/2016. (Kusamura, W)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 202 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Denying Defendant's Motion to Decertify the Late Meal Break Class 189 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/12/2016. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER Extending Time to File Opposition and Reply for Defendant's Motion to De-Certify the Late Meal Period Class, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/12/2016. (Kusamura, W)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER SETTING Briefing Schedule for Motion to Decertify, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/2/2015. Motion filed by 1/15/2016; Opposition due by 2/12/2016; Reply due by 3/4/2016; Hearing no later than 4/25/2016. Further Status Conference set for 6/23/2016 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER GRANTING, in part, and DENYING, in part, defendant's Motion for Summary Adjudication, document 156 . Summary adjudication of plaintiffs' first PAGA claim based on failure to provide timely meal periods is GRANTED in favor of defendant. Summary adjudication of plaintiffs' second PAGA claim based on failure to reimburse workers for tools is DENIED. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/11/2015. (Rooney, M)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER EXTENDING TIME to File Defendant's Surreply Brief re 177 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/26/2015. Defendant's surreply brief in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment due by 5/11/2015. (Hall, S)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER AFTER FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/23/2015. Reply Brief due no later than 4/13/2015. Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment set for 6/15/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hall, S)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER SETTING FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/24/2015. Further Status Conference set for 3/23/2015 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Telephonic appearances via CourtCall are authorized. (Hall, S)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER SETTING FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/30/2015. Status Conference set for 2/20/2015 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adjudication and Further Status Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/15/2014. Opposition to plaintiffs' motion for summary adjudication due by 1/23/2015. Further Status Conference set for 1/30/2015 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER GRANTING 145 Stipulation to Extend the Deadline to File Dispositive Motions; ORDER CONTINUING Status Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/20/2014. Status Conference CONTINUED to 10/15/2014 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/17/2014. Merits Discovery Deadline 2/16/2015. Motion for Summary Adjudication filed by 9/19/2014. Further Status Conference set for 10/1/2014 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER GRANTING Final Approval of the Class Notice re 136 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/11/2013. (Hall, S)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiffs' Request for Approval of the Revised Class Notice; Order Appointing Class Notice Administrator re 134 ; ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF to file an Amended Class Notice No Later Than December 2, 2013, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/27/2013. (Hall, S)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER REGARDING THE PROPOSED CLASS NOTICE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/18/2013. (Hall, S)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Appointing The Law Firms Of Mallison & Martinez and Kingsley & Kingsley As Class Counsel, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/8/2013.Attorney Darren Michael Cohen,Eric Bryce Kingsley for Lidia Cruz,Darren Michael Cohen,Eric Bryce Kingsley for Yanet Hernandez,Darren Michael Cohen,Eric Bryce Kingsley for Rafael Munoz,Darren Michael Cohen,Eric Bryce Kingsley for Ramon Cervantes Perales,Darren Michael Cohen,Eric Bryce Kingsley for Hugo Perez Rios,Darren Michael Cohen,Eric Bryce Kingsley for Santos R. Valenzuela,Darren Michael Cohen,Eric Bryce Kingsley for Marta R. Rincon de Diaz added. (Fahrney, E)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER SETTING A BRIEFING SCHEDULE Regarding the Proposed Class Notice, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/15/2013. (Hall, S)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Discharging the Order to Show Cause dated October 7, 2013, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/8/2013. (Kusamura, W)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER to Plaintiffs to SHOW CAUSE why sanctions should not be imposed for plaintiff's failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the court's order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/7/2013. (Show Cause Response due in 14 days.)(Kusamura, W)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiffs to File a Proposed Class Notice, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/16/2013. (Hall, S)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/31/2013. (Plaintiffs are ordered to file a proposed notice within twenty-one (21) days of the filing of this order for the courts approval.)(Gaumnitz, R)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION to extend time to file objections to proposed 109 Findings and Recommendations regarding class certification ; ORDER, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/16/2012. ( Objections to F&R due by 8/2/2012) (Figueroa, O)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS GRANTING in Part and DENYING in Part Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification 42 and ORDER DENYING as Moot Motion to Strike the Declaration of Christopher Purdy 98 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/5/2012. Referred to Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 7/19/2012.(Hall, S)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER LIFTING THE STAY and DIRECTING the parties to file supplemental briefs. The parties shall file supplemental briefs, no longer than 15 pages, including exhibits, discussing only the decision in Brinker and its effect upon pl aintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, on or before 5/25/2012. The Court FURTHER SETS the Motion to Certify Class, document 42 , for hearing on 7/2/2012 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 18th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston; order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/26/2012. (Rooney, M)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting Extension of Time, ORDER Denying Further Discovery, and ORDER Requiriing All Parties to Supplement Rule 26 Disclosures signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/8/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/24/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DENYING 66 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order Without Prejudice, Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/19/2011. (Arellano, S.)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER AMENDING Scheduling Conference Order 34 to Extend Deadline by Which to File Motion for Class Certification, Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/3/2011. The deadline for filing the motion for class certification is extended to July 1, 2011. (Arellano, S.)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re: Appointment of interim class counsel and consolidation of cases signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/18/2009. (Lundstrom, T)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Appointing Interim Class Counsel signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 07/16/2009. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: [GSA] Munoz et al v. Giumarra Vineyards Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Munoz
Represented By: Sabrina Seungyoun Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidia Cruz
Represented By: Sabrina Seungyoun Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yanet Hernandez
Represented By: Sabrina Seungyoun Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giumarra Vineyards Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?