Shepard v. Quillen
Plaintiff: Lamont Shepard
Defendant: T. Quillen
Case Number: 1:2009cv00809
Filed: May 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 191 Motion for Funds, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/27/17. (Gonzalez, R)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Requiring Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's 191 Motion for Funds, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/1/17. Response Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER that Inmate Lamont Shepard Is No Longer Needed as a Witness In These Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/24/17. (Gonzalez, R)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER Following Settlement; Vacating Dates and Directing Parties to File Dispositive Documents within Fourteen Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/24/17. (Gonzalez, R)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Inmate Lamont Shepard, CDCR #K-29682, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/24/17. (Marrujo, C)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 02/08/2017. ( Settlement Conference set for 3/24/2017 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone at California State Prison, Corcoran, 4001 King Avenue, Corcoran, CA 93212) (Martin-Gill, S)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER Re-Captioning Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/20/16: This matter currently proceeds only against Defendant J. Wise. (Hellings, J)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER DENYING 160 Motion for Trial Transcripts at Government Expense, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/20/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 JUDGMENT dated *3/26/2013* pursuant to order. (Fahrney, E)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER That Plaintiff Lamont Shepard, CDC# K-29682, Is No Longer Needed As Witness In These Proceedings, And The Writ Of Habeas Ad Testificandum Is Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/20/2013. (Fahrney, E)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER Requiring Production of Plaintiff for Trial on March 20, 2013 at 8:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/19/13. (Gonzalez, R)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/12/2013 re 116 , 119 MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Plaintiff; re 120 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION by Plaintiff and re 121 , 122 , 123 , 125 , 126 MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Defendants.(Lundstrom, T)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Lamont Shepard, #K-29682, for Trial on March 19, 2013 at 8:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/5/13. (Gonzalez, R)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Assigning Action to United States Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe 5 and 109 ; New case number is: 1:09-cv-809 BAM PC, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/6/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Disregarding Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendant Quillen's Disclosure Of Expert Witness Information (ECF No. 101 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/22/2013. (Fahrney, E)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 97 Motion a Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/16/12. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER REQUIRING Parties to Notify Court Whether a Settlement Conference Would Be Beneficial TWENTY-DAY DEADLINE, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/25/12. (Hellings, J)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Evidentiary Hearing 94 ; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Send Copy of Motion for Attendance of Witnesses to Plaintiff 88 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/8/12. (Hellings, J)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 91 Motion for the Attendance of Witnesses signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/2/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Striking Motion For Attendance Of Witnesses From Record For Lack Of Signature (ECF No. 88 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/24/2012. (Fahrney, E)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations 84 and Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 73 and Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 84 ; ORDER Striking Plaintiff's Surreply 82 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/12/12. (Verduzco, M)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 73 ; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 74 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/30/12. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections due within thirty days. (Verduzco, M)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER ADOPTING 69 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing and Injunctive Relief, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 02/01/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 68 Motion and WITHDRAWING 63 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/25/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Striking 61 Plaintiff's Pretrial Statement, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/18/11. (Verduzco, M)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion to Conduct Depositions by Video Conference 59 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/24/11. (Gonzalez, R)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 53 Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/3/2011. (Marrujo, C)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Extending Application Discovery and Scheduling Order 40 to Defendant Wise, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/1/11. (Verduzco, M)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER CORRECTING 48 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for a Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/24/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 45 Motion for a Settlement Conference; ORDER STRIKING 46 Amended Complaint and Plaintiff's 47 Pretrial Statement signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/23/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Striking 43 Motion to Contend Defendnat Quillen's Affirmative Defenses, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/16/2011. (Gonzalez, R)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Be Denied 27 , 31 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/15/11: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant's 27 Motion to Dismiss be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/2/2011. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 3/10/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING 23 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/15/2010. The Court HEREBY ORDERS that Defendant's 13 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED; Plaintiff's retaliation claim against Defendant Quillen is DISMISSED, with leave to amend; and this action shall proceed on Plaintiff's August 12, 2010 first amended complaint. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to file the lodged August 12, 2010 first amended complaint.(Bradley, A)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendants 13 motion to dismiss be GRANTED; Recommending Plaintiffs retaliation claim against Defendant Quillen be DISMISSED; and Recommending Plaintiff be given (30) days to file an amended complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/30/2010, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 9/7/2010 (Marrujo, C)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendant's 13 MOTION to DISMISS; Response due Within 30 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/22/2010. Filing Deadline: 7/26/2010.(Bradley, A)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING 11 Request for Entry of Default filed by Lamont Shepard, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 02/02/2010. (Martin, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shepard v. Quillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamont Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Quillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?