La-Kebbia Wilson et al v. City of Fresno, et al
Plaintiff: La-Kebbia Wilson and Teri McCada
Defendant: City Of Fresno, Jerry Bishop, Matthew Lopez, Barbara Miller and Nick Yovino
Case Number: 1:2009cv00887
Filed: May 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR TERI MCCADA. Plaintiff/judgment debtor Teri McCada shall appear personally on Wednesday, 2/11/2015, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto in Courtroom 7 of the United States District Courthouse, located at 2500 Tulare Street, Fresno, California, 93721, to furnish information to aid in enforcement of a money judgment by answering questions about the Plaintiff/judgment debtors real and person property; Defendant/judgment creditor must serve this order upon Plaintiff/judgment debtor Teri McCada personally not less than ten (10) days before the date set for the examination and must file a certificate of such service with the Court; and if Defendant/ judgment creditor is unable to effectuate personal service on Plaintiff/judgment debtor Teri McCada within the required time, Defendant/judgment creditor must file notice with the Court by no later than nine (9) days before the date set for the examination and inform the Court that the examination hearing must be taken off calendar. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/18/2014. (Timken, A)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER for APPEARANCE and EXAMINATION of JUDGMENT DEBTOR TERI MCCADA. Defendant/judgment debtor Teri McCada shall appear personally on Wednesday, June 11, 2014, at 12:00 p.m. (noon) in Courtroom 7 of the United States District Courthouse, located at 2 500 Tulare Street, Fresno, California, 93721, to furnish information to aid in enforcement of a money judgment by answering questions about the Defendant/ judgment debtor's real and personal property; Defendant/judgment creditor must serve thi s order upon Plaintiff/judgment debtor Teri McCada personally not less than ten (10) days before the date set for the examination and must file a certificate of such service with the Court; and if Defendant/judgment creditor is unable to effectuate p ersonal service on Plaintiff/judgment debtor within the required time, Defendant/judgment creditor must file notice with the Court by no later than ten (10) days before the date set for the examination and inform the Court that the examination hearing must be taken off calendar. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/29/2014. (Timken, A)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor Teru McCada. Debtor Examination Hearing set for 3/12/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/12/2014. (Kusamura, W)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER to Dismiss and to Close Action, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/9/12. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER on Plaintiff's Motions In Limine (Doc. 73 ), Signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/20/2012. (Arellano, S.)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on June 8, 2011. Motions in limine filed by 3/6/2012. Responses due by 3/13/2012. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Lira, I)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER on Defendant's 30 Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/29/2011. The Court GRANTS the Motion for Summary Judgment in Favor of Defendant City of Fresno and Against Plaintiff Terri McCada. (Marrujo, C)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER to Dismiss Defendants Jerry Bishop, Matthew Lopez and Nick Yovino By Plaintiff Teri McCada, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/8/11: The clerk is directed to not to close this action. (Hellings, J)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER to DISMISS Defendants Matthew Lopez and Barbara Miller By Plaintiff La-Kebbia Wilson, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/3/11: The clerk is DIRECTED not to close this action. (Hellings, J)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/2/2011. (Rooney, M)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 1, 2009. Motion Hearing currently set for 10/7/09 has been VACATED. (Lira, I)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: La-Kebbia Wilson et al v. City of Fresno, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La-Kebbia Wilson
Represented By: Rayma Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri McCada
Represented By: Rayma Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Fresno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Yovino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?