January 28, 2011 |
Filing
64
ORDER to Dismiss and to Close Action, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/28/11. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
|
January 4, 2011 |
Filing
62
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING 54 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT referred to Judge O'Neill. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/3/2011. (Hernandez, M)
|
December 13, 2010 |
Filing
61
STIPULATION and ORDER to VACATE Scheduled Trial date of 2/22/2011 and Pretrial Conference of 1/6/2011 set before Judge O'Neill. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/13/2010. (Hernandez, M)
|
November 10, 2010 |
Filing
57
ORDER ADOPTING 53 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/09/2010. (Flores, E)
|
October 5, 2010 |
Filing
53
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 48 Motion to Dismiss Cause of Action for Retaliation signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/5/2010. The Court RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's cause of action for retaliation against Defendants Vargas, Nacar, Van Natta and Smith be DISMISSED for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 10/19/2010. (Bradley, A)
|
August 12, 2010 |
Filing
47
ORDER ADOPTING IN FULL 44 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS which DENIES Defendants Motion for Summary Adjudication AND DENIES Without Prejudice Defendants Renewed Motion to Dismiss Misjoined Defendants 33 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/11/2010. (Marrujo, C)
|
July 14, 2010 |
Filing
44
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 33 Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication - Order DENYING without prejudice Renewed Motion to Dismiss Misjoined Defendants - Motion is referred to Judge O'Neill; Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/13/2010. (Hernandez, M)
|
May 21, 2010 |
Filing
38
ORDER GRANTING plaintiff's Motion to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication, 37 , and CONTINUING it from the currently noticed date of 6/11/2010 to 6/25/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck (summary judgment motion 33 ); order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/20/2010. (Rooney, M)
|
March 9, 2010 |
Filing
27
ORDER on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Sever re 15 , 17 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/8/2010. This Court DISMISSES with prejudice the (first) section 1983, (second) dependent adult abuse, (fourth) retaliation cl aim and (fifth) intentional infliction of emotional distress claims against Warden Adams and CMO McGuinness; DISMISSES with prejudice the (third) medical malpractice claim against CMO McGuinness; DIRECTS the clerk to enter judgment in favor of defend ants Derral G. Adams and William J. McGuinness and against plaintiff Steven C. Martinez; SEVERS and DISMISSES without prejudice claims against defendants Cornelio Garcia and Paul Sena from this action; ORDERS Mr. Martinez, no later than March 22, 201 0, to file a separate action against defendants Cornelio Garcia and Paul Sena, if he continues to desire to pursue claims against them; ORDERS the parties to proceed in this action with only Mr. Martinez claims against nurse defendants Frances Garza , Emily Vargas, Catherine Nacar, Michael Van Natta, and Mike Smith; and ORDERS nurse defendants Frances Garza, Emily Vargas, Catherine Nacar, Michael Van Natta, and Mike Smith, no later than March 22, 2010, to file and serve a response to Mr. Martinez complaint. William J. McGuinness; Paul Sena; Derral Adams and Cornelio Garcia terminated. (Bradley, A)
|
February 12, 2010 |
Filing
21
STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Scheduling Conference from 3/2/2010 to 4/22/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/11/2010. (Hernandez, M)
|
September 4, 2009 |
Filing
12
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT 120 days to 1/19/2010. The Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 3/2/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/4/2009. (Hernandez, M)
|
September 2, 2009 |
Filing
9
ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S 8 Motion to Stay Proceedings in Order to Exhaust Administrative Remedies. The Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2009 at 9:15 am, shall proceed as previously scheduled. signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/2/2009. (Hernandez, M)
|