April 17, 2017 |
Filing
986
ORDER CLOSING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/14/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
|
March 20, 2017 |
Filing
985
NOTICE OF COURTS INTENT TO CLOSE CASE; TWENTY-ONE (21) DAY RESPONSE DEADLINE, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/18/2017. (Lafata, M)
|
May 25, 2016 |
Filing
978
ORDER Following Settlement; Vacating Dates signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/25/2016. (Valdez, E)
|
May 18, 2016 |
Filing
968
ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FOR MAY 25, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M. AND NOTIFYING PARTIES OF REQUIREMENTS FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/18/2016. (Hernandez, M)
|
May 4, 2016 |
Filing
959
Order On Objections To Pretrial Order (ECF No. 955 and 956),signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 05/04/2016. (Yu, L)
|
February 29, 2016 |
Filing
944
Order Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendant Fresno Madera Land Bank's Motion For Reconsideration and/or Clarification (ECF No.936) signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/29/2016. (Yu, L)
|
February 1, 2016 |
Filing
938
Order Regarding Presentation Of Punitive Damages ECF No. 931 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/1/2016. (Yu, L)
|
January 25, 2016 |
Filing
935
Order Denying Defendant Fresno Madera Land Bank's Motion To Strike Jury Demand (ECF No. 913), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/23/2016. (Yu, L)
|
December 23, 2015 |
Filing
932
ORDER granting in part defendant Fresno Madera Land Bank's motion in limine, document 911 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/23/2015. (Rooney, M)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing
931
ORDER for supplemental briefing regarding punitive damages, document 916 . The Court seeks further briefing from the parties setting forth their proposals or stipulation on this issue as well as authority for proceeding as they propose. The suppl emental briefing should be short, no more than five (5) pages in length, and filed on or before January 22, 2016. The Court will then issue an order regarding how it will proceed. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/21/2015. (Rooney, M)
|
June 26, 2015 |
Filing
897
ORDER TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Scheduling Conference is now set for September 4, 2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 06/26/2015. (Yu, L)
|
May 6, 2015 |
Filing
895
ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for a continuance of the Scheduling Conference currently set for 5/8/2015 and CONTINUING it to 7/2/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/5/2015. (Rooney, M)
|
May 5, 2015 |
Filing
894
ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/5/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
|
July 3, 2013 |
Filing
881
ORDER GRANTING 879 Judgment in the Sole Favor of Frank A. Logoluso Farms, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/2/2013. (Marrujo, C)
|
June 28, 2013 |
Filing
880
ORDER vacating hearing of July 1, 2013 and taking matter under submission. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/28/13. (Nazaroff, H)
|
May 9, 2013 |
Filing
877
ORDER ON TRUSTEES MOTION TO APPROVE FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNTING AND REQUEST TO RELIEVE TRUSTEE, TERENCE J. LONG, FROM HIS DUTIES AND TO CLOSE THE TRUST signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/9/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
|
March 27, 2013 |
Filing
871
ORDER Vacating March 29, 2013 Status Conference and requiring parties to submit Status Report. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/27/13. (Nazaroff, H)
|
March 22, 2013 |
Filing
870
JUDGMENT Following Acceptance of Defendant Martin J. Zaninovich's Offer of Judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 68 by Plaintiff; ORDERED that Judgment is entered In Favor of Plaintiff as Against Defendant Martin J. Zaninovich, in the cumulative sum of $3,317,859.50, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/21/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
February 27, 2013 |
Filing
869
STIPULATION and ORDER TO CONTINUE JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION OF ARON MARGOSIAN. Judgment Debtor Exam is now set for 4/5/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/26/2013. (Yu, L)
|
February 4, 2013 |
Filing
866
STIPULATION For Voluntary Dismissal; ORDER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/1/2013. (Fahrney, E)
|
February 1, 2013 |
Filing
865
STIPULATION For Voluntary Dismissal; ORDER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/31/2013. (Fahrney, E)
|
November 29, 2012 |
Filing
858
STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Judgment Debtor Examination of Carrie Margosian (Doc. 856 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/28/2012. The Judgment Debtor Examination set for 11/30/2012 is CONTINUED to 1/11/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Arellano, S.)
|
November 19, 2012 |
Filing
854
ORDER Requiring Appearance of Aron Margosian at Judgment Debtor Examination and Production of Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/17/2012. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Flores, E)
|
July 27, 2012 |
Filing
837
ORDER Directing Entry of Judgment Following Summary Judgment in Favor of Intervenor Defendant Fresno-Madera Federal Land Bank Association, FLCA, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 07/26/2012. (Flores, E)
|
July 24, 2012 |
Filing
835
ORDER GRANTING 778 Motion for Summary Judgment by Intervenor Defendant Fresno-Madera Federal Land Bank Association, FLCA signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 07/23/2012. (Yu, L)
|
May 18, 2012 |
Filing
826
CORRECTIONAL ORDER; ORDER Withdrawing 823 Order for Severance; and ORDER for Separate Trials Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(b), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/18/12. (Verduzco, M)
|
May 15, 2012 |
Filing
823
ORDER For Serverance Of Claims And Assignment Of Specified Severed Claim To Magistrate Judge For All Purposes, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/14/2012. (Fahrney, E)
|
February 16, 2012 |
Filing
803
STIPULATION and ORDER for VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/15/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
|
December 19, 2011 |
Filing
776
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal; ORDER signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/16/2011. Plaintiffs, Onions, Etc, Inc., Duda Farm Fresh Foods, Inc. Cecelia Packing Corporation, John A. Clark and Addison W. Clark, Jr. dba Clark Farms, Rio Vist a, Ltd. dba Giumarra Farms, Inc., Giumarra International Marketing, APB, Inc. dba Tavilla Sales Company of Los Angeles and Calvao Growers, Inc is dismissed with prejudice as against Defendants Two Play Farms, Three Play Farms and Four Play Ranch. (Marrujo, C)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing
770
AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/06/2011. Terence J. Long terminated from action. (Flores, E)
|
December 5, 2011 |
Filing
767
STIPULATION and ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/2/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
|
August 19, 2011 |
Filing
734
STIPULATION and ORDER (1) Approving Verified Final Report of Administration and Accounting by Receiver; (2) Waiving Noticed Hearing thereon; (3) Approving Payment of Legal Fees and Costs Incurred by Receiver and Receivership Estate; (4) Approving Com pensation to Receiver for Fees and Expenses Incurred as a result thereof; (5) Instructing Receiver on Disposition of Check Proceeds Held by Receiver; and (6) Terminating Receivership, Discharging Receiver from his duties and Exonerating the Bond, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/18/2011. (Kusamura, W)
|
August 11, 2011 |
Filing
731
JUDGMENT regarding Trustee's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/10/2011. (Kusamura, W)
|
August 9, 2011 |
Filing
728
ORDER on Defendants' Summary Judgment Motions, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/9/2011. (Kusamura, W)
|
August 2, 2011 |
Filing
725
MEMORANDUM, DECISION and ORDER; RE: (1) Trustee's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Summary Adjudication: and (2) Defendants, Loren Schoenberg's and Margaret Schoenberg's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternatively, Adjudication of issues,signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/2/2011. (Kusamura, W)
|
July 14, 2011 |
Filing
713
ORDER Authorizing receiver to sell propoerty, Approving Agreement with Approving Buyer, and Approving Overbid Procedures, Filing Bids Deadline: 7/19/2011, Hearing set for 7/20/2011 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/14/2011. (Kusamura, W)
|
July 12, 2011 |
Filing
705
STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Pretrial Conference and Trial Date and ORDER Thereon signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/11/2011. ( Dispositive Motions as to Land Bank Only filed by 11/4/2011; Dispositive Motions Hearing as to Land Bank Only set for 12/5/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger; Pretrial Conference set for 12/5/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger; Jury Trial set for 1/17/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger ) (Figueroa, O)
|
July 5, 2011 |
Filing
694
ORDER GRANTING the Ex Parte Application for an ORDER SHORTENING TIME for hearing on the Motion for Order Authorizing Receiver to Sell the Property, Approving the Agreement with the Proposed Buyer, and Approving the Overbid Procedures, document 688 . The Motion Hearing is set for 7/13/2011 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger with responses to same due by 7/12/2011 by 3:00 PM with replies to be presented orally at the time of the hearing; order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/5/2011. (Rooney, M)
|
June 15, 2011 |
Filing
674
***DISREGARD ORDER IS INCORRECT***ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 7/15/2011. signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/14/2011. (Kusamura, W) Modified on 6/15/2011 (Kusamura, W).
|
June 13, 2011 |
Filing
673
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S ARON MARGOSIAN AND CARRIE MARGOSIAN'S MOTION TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM 642 (Defendant's shall file Verified First Amended Answer and Counter-Claim. Fresno-Madera Federal Land Bank Association has twenty one (21) days from date of filing to file its response.) signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/13/2011. (Yu, L)
|
May 13, 2011 |
Filing
647
ORDER Shortening Time For Hearing On Petition For Instructions, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/12/2011. ( 644 Motion to Shorten Time GRANTED. Hearing on Petition for Instructions set for 5/23/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before J udge Oliver W. Wanger. A copy of this Order and the moving papers are to be filed and served by facsimile or personal service on all parties/counsel on or before 5/13/2011, by 5:00 p.m. Any opposition to the Ex Parte Application is to be filed and served by facsimile or personal service on all parties/counsel on or before 5/19/2011. No reply papers may be filed.) (Gaumnitz, R)
|
May 10, 2011 |
Filing
646
STIPULATION and ORDER to Set a Date for Further Settlement Conference and Continue Dispositive Motion Filing and Hearing Dates signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/9/2011. (Settlement Conference set for 6/2/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) b efore Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng; Dispositive Motions filed by 6/24/2011; Dispositve Motion Hearing previously set for 6/20/2011 has been CONTINUED to 7/25/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger) (Figueroa, O)
|
April 15, 2011 |
Filing
639
Courtroom Decorum. (Gaumnitz, R)
|
April 13, 2011 |
Filing
637
STIPULATION and ORDER to Establish a PACA Claims Procedure to allow Fresno-Madera Federal Land Bank Assocaition, FCLA, to object to certain PACA Trust Claims signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 4/11/2011. (Figueroa, O)
|
April 12, 2011 |
Filing
635
ORDER AUTHORIZING Employment of Counsel re 632 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 4/11/2011. (Jessen, A)
|
March 14, 2011 |
Filing
625
STIPULATION and ORDER For Appointment of Receiver For Limited Purpose, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/11/2011. (Gaumnitz, R)
|
February 15, 2011 |
Filing
619
ORDER signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/14/2011 re 597 MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY of record for Diego Lua by Joseph Lewis Horswill. Attorney Joseph Lewis Horswill and the Law Firm of Horswill, Mederos & Soares are termianted from this action.(Lundstrom, T)
|
February 2, 2011 |
Filing
604
STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING the Complaint in Intervention Initiated by Intervenor Plaintiff Terence J. Long, Trustee Pursuant to Court Order Against Intervenor Defendant Bank of the West, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/1/2011. (Jessen, A)
|
November 17, 2010 |
Filing
599
ORDER RE SCHEDULING, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/16/2010. (Non Expert Discovery ddl 1/24/2011, Disclose Expert Witnesses by 2/14/2011, Discovery Cut-Off 4/14/2011, Non-Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline: 5/2/2011, Non-Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng., Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline: 5/16/2011, Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. W anger, Settlement Comference set for 2/16/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng, Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, and Jury Trial set for 9/13/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger.) (Gaumnitz, R)
|
October 6, 2010 |
Filing
593
ORDER on Motion by Walter & Wilhelm Law Group, a Professional Corporation, to Withdraw and Terminate Further legal Represetation on Z&S Fresh Inc., signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/05/2010. Attorney Riley C. Walter terminated from action. Substitution of Attorney due by 11/8/2010.(Flores, E)
|
September 20, 2010 |
Filing
589
STIPULATION and ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/17/2010. Action by plaintiff in intervention, Two Play Properties, is DISMISSED with prejudice as against defendant Martin J. Zaninovich only. (Esteves, C)
|
September 14, 2010 |
Filing
577
ORDER re Walter & Wilhelm Law Group, a Professional Corporation's Ex Parte Application for Order Permitting Filing of Sealed Document in Connection with Motion to Withdraw and Terminate Representation, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/10/2010. (Verduzco, M)
|
September 13, 2010 |
Filing
576
JUDGMENT Following Acceptance of Defendant Martin J. Zaninovich's Offer of Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 68 by Plaintiff, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/9/2010. (Verduzco, M)
|
September 7, 2010 |
Filing
573
STIPULATION and ORDER that the above-captioned Action by Visalia Produce Sales, Inc., dba Produce Source Against Z&S Fresh, Inc., be DISMISSED with Prejudice signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/3/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
|
August 31, 2010 |
Filing
570
ORDER on Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Motion For Protective Order, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/30/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
|
August 27, 2010 |
Filing
569
JUDGMENT Following Acceptance of Defendant Martin J. Zaninovich's Offer of Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 68 by Plaintiffs Represented by Rynn & Janowsky signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/26/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
|
July 8, 2010 |
Filing
508
ORDER granting 473 Motion for Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/8/2010. (Yu, L)
|
July 7, 2010 |
Filing
506
ORDER BY THE COURT on Trustee's Motion For Further Instruction, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/6/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
|
July 2, 2010 |
Filing
505
ORDER After Hearing on 259 I.G. Fruit's Motion to Determine Validity of and Objections to PACA Claim Filed by I.G. Fruit, Inc., Signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/2/2010. (Arellano, S.)
|
June 22, 2010 |
Filing
492
ORDER DIRECTING Counsel to File Basis for Opposition to Motion to Exceed the Discovery Limitations, Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/22/2010. Response due 6/30/2010; Reply, if any, due 7/5/2010. (Arellano, S.)
|
March 9, 2010 |
Filing
438
CORRECTIVE ORDER Granting the Motion of Defendant Fresno-Madera Federal Land Bank Association, FCLA, for Leave to File Amended Complaint [Doc. 410]. DENYING Defendant Land Bank's Motion to Strike [Doc. 422]. REVOKING This Court's Prior Order [Doc. 430]. signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 3/8/2010. (Herman, H)
|
February 16, 2010 |
Filing
430
Revoking this Court's ORDER (see doc. 438) - Granting Defendant Fresno-Madera Land Bank Association, FCLA'S Counter Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint 410 and Denying The Trustee's Motion to Intervene 422 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/11/2010. (Herman, H)
|
December 18, 2009 |
Filing
403
STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Agreement and Resolution of PACA Claim Amounts of PACA Claimant/Intervening Plaintiff Dandrea Produce, Inc., signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/19/2009. (Verduzco, M)
|
December 16, 2009 |
Filing
401
OMNIBUS ORDER Identifying Agreed PACA Claim Amounts Pursuant to Settlements Filed on 12/3/2009 and 12/4/2009 Pursuant to Order at Hearing on 12/4/2009, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/15/2009. (Verduzco, M)
|
December 7, 2009 |
Filing
393
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/4/09 regarding Agreement and Resolution of PACA Claim Amounts of PACA Claimant / Intervening Plaintiff, Del Monte Fresh Produce, N.A.(Lundstrom, T)
|
October 23, 2009 |
Filing
352
ORDER CONTINUING all hearings currently set for 10/30/2009 to 12/4/2009 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger (documents 230 233 234 235 249 255 257 259 260 ); motion hearing set for 12/4/2009 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger; order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/23/2009. (Rooney, M)
|
September 10, 2009 |
Filing
300
ORDER GRANTING Intervening Plaintiff Rick Dreo's Motion for Relief from Order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/9/2009. (Figueroa, O)
|
September 8, 2009 |
Filing
295
STIPULATION to Allow PACA Claimant Rick Dreo to File a Late Motion to Determine Nature, Validity and Priority of Lien signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/3/2009. (Figueroa, O)
|
September 2, 2009 |
Filing
276
ORDER After Proceedings, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/31/2009. The Court hereby orders and reaffirms that its Preliminary Injunction Order, Establishing a PACA Claims Procedure Order and Appointing Terence J. Long, CPA as PACA Trustee remains in full force and effect. (Scrivner, E)
|
August 11, 2009 |
Filing
241
STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend the Date on Which to File a Motion to Determine Validity, Priority, or Amount of PACA Claim, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/10/09: Claimants' Motion Filing ddl EXTENDED from 8/10/2009 to 8/24/2009.(Hellings, J)
|
August 10, 2009 |
Filing
227
STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend the Date on Which to File a Motion to Determine Validity, Priority or Amount of PACA Claim, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/7/09: Claimant's Motion Filing DDL is EXTENDED from 8/10/09 to 8/17/2009.(Hellings, J)
|
July 30, 2009 |
Filing
206
STIPULATION and ORDER for Repayment of Grower Advances signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/24/2009. (Flores, E)
|