Lawson v. Youngblood
Plaintiff: Richard Alan Lawson
Defendant: Donald Youngblood
Case Number: 1:2009cv00992
Filed: June 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Pursuant to Stipulation signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/12/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Dismissing Defendant Clemente for Insufficient Information to Effect Service of Process; Fourteen-Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/26/2014. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 7/14/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why Defendant Clemente Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Provide Sufficient Information to Effectuate Service of Process 86 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/18/14: Thirty Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DENYING 77 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings and Undisputed Facts signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/21/2014. (Jessen, A)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF to Clarify His Current Address signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/1/2014. Notice due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting U.S. Marshals' Request for Reimbursement of Costs of Serving Defendant Chang 73 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/20/14. (Verduzco, M)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER ADOPTING 71 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER DENYING 64 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/19/2014. (Jessen, A)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/22/2014 recommending that 64 MOTION to DISMISS be DENIED. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 2/10/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DENYING 67 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/4/2013. (Jessen, A)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/5/2012 adopting 54 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying without prejudice 37 Motion to Dismiss.(Lundstrom, T)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/29/2012 recommending that 37 MOTION to Dismiss be DENIED. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 11/16/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION 49 ; ORDER STRIKING CORRECTION OFADDRESS AND REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO USE HIS ADDRESS OF INCARCERATION 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/25/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 43 Urgent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss; Notice and Warning of Requirement for Opposing Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/4/12. Twenty-One Day Deadline to File Response and Correction to Current Address. (Gonzalez, R)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DISCHARGING 18 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed For Failure to Comply With Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/16/2011. (Marrujo, C)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Finding that Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint States a Cognizable Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/1/11. (Verduzco, M)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Comply With Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/26/2011. Plaintiff Must File Second Amended Complaint by August 25, 2011. (Jessen, A)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/14/2011. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawson v. Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Alan Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?