Altman v. HO Sports Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Altman
Defendant: HO Sports Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01000
Filed: June 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 264 STIPULATION and ORDER of DISMISSAL signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/12/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER VACATING Trial and All Other Scheduled Dates in Light of 261 Notice of Settlement; Parties shall file Dispositional papers through Rule 41 as soon as possible, but no later than October 19, 2011, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 09/28/2011. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER on Defendant's 170 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 05/17/2011. (Flores, E)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 196 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue the Pretrial Conference currently set for 5/26/2011 to 5/27/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/2/2011. (Kusamura, W)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER RESETTING Pre-Trial Conference to May 26, 2011, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/18/11: Pretrial Conference RESET to 5/26/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hellings, J)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER vacating hearing date of 2/28/2011 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/24/2011. (Nazaroff, H)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/2/2010. (Nazaroff, H)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER Amending Scheduling Order 163 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/19/2010. Dispositive pretrial Motions filed by 1/7/2011, hearing by 3/7/2011. Jury Trial set for 7/5/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii, Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER SUSTAINING plaintiff's objections to defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, documents 105 136 139 , and FURTHER ORDERING said motion STRICKEN as filed in violation of the Scheduling Order; order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/3/2010. (Rooney, M)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER vacating hearing date of November 15, 2010, order for response to objections, and order holding motion in abeyance signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/26/2010. (Nazaroff, H)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of the discovery deadline to allow for the deposition of Rusty Malinowski; non-expert discovery deadline extended to 10/6/2010 in which time the deposition of Mr. Malinowski ONLY is to be completed. The Court DENIES defendant's request to extend the deadline to take the deposition of Skylar Dubrow; order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/17/2010. (Rooney, M)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Denying 61 Leave to File Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/16/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER 72 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/1/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 55 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/31/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER Modifying Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/26/2010. Joint Expert Disclosure extended to 9/7/2010. Joint Rebuttal Expert Disclosure extended to 9/21/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Pre-Trial Deadlines, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/14/10: Pleading Amendment Deadline EXTENDED to 9/30/2010.(Hellings, J)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ON STIPULATION 50 Extending Pretrial Deadlines signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/15/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and ORDER extending pre-trial deadlines signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/14/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING 28 Motion to Dismiss ; 29 Motion to Dismiss ; 30 Motion to Dismiss; Defendant Ben Sims is DISMISSED from this case; First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND and Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within twenty (20) days of service of this order, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/19/2009. (Martin, S)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER VACATING November 23, 2009 Hearing and Taking Matters Under Submission signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/17/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER VACATING September 8, 2009, Hearing and Taking Matters Under Submission, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/1/09: The hearing date of September 8, 2009, is VACATED, and Parties shall not appear at that time; As of September 8, 2009, the Court will take Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike 8 under submission and will thereafter issue its decision. (Hellings, J)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Correcting Order of August 20, 2009, Nunc Pro Tunc 19 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/27/09: Plaintiff's motion to remand is correct nunc pro tunc to reflect that the September 8, 2009, hearing date on the motion to remand is vacated.(Hellings, J)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER VACATING the September 14, 2009 Hearing on Plaintiff's 7 Motion to Remand, and ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 7 Motion to Remand, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/20/2009. (Sondheim, M)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Requiring Any Reply Regarding Plaintiff's Motion To Remand To Be Filed On Or By August 14, 2009 7 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/7/2009. (Response to Motion to Remand Deadline: 8/14/2009) (Scrivner, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altman v. HO Sports Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HO Sports Company, Inc.
Represented By: Randolph T. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Altman
Represented By: Illya Hooshang Broomand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?