Clifford L. Edwards v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Clifford L. Edwards
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2009cv01002
Filed: June 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint; ORDERED to do Judgment In Favor of Defendant: Michael J. Astrue, Commissioner of Social Security and against Plaintiff Clifford Edwards, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 07/22/2010. CASE CLOSED (Martin, S)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER for extension of time to respond to opening brief. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/6/2010. (Hernandez, M)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME - Plaintiff's opening brief shall be filed on or before 3/7/2010. Defendant's opposition, if any, shall be filed on or before April 6, 2010. Plaintiff's reply shall be filed on or before April 21, 2010. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/10/2010. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifford L. Edwards v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford L. Edwards
Represented By: Laura Eve Krank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?