Boparai v. Shinseki et al
Plaintiff: Rosie Boparai
Defendant: Eric K. Shinseki, Secretary of Veterans Affairs and United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 1:2009cv01164
Filed: July 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING 65 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and ORDER GRANTING 102 Defendant's Motion to Strike signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/30/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER vacating hearing date of June 27, 2011 and taking matter under submission signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/22/2011. (Nazaroff, H)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Re Request to File Document Under Seal signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/12/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER vacating hearing date of 4/11/2011 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/6/2011. (Nazaroff, H)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re: Motion to Reopen Discovery, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/17/11. The schedule for Defendant's motion for summary judgment is postponed one week. (Verduzco, M)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER SETTING New Briefing and Hearing Dates for Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 65 ), Signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/25/2011. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Pretrial Conference of 4/12/2011 VACATED. (Arellano, S.)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER VACATING Hearing Date of February 22, 2011 and Taking Matter Under Submission (re 65 Motion for Summary Judgment), Signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/17/2011. (Arellano, S.)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 57 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/15/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery Time, ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time for Disclosure of Experts, Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on November 12, 2010. Plaintiff is ordered to make her expert disclosure no later than December 3, 2010. The Scheduling Order is amended to reflect the revised expert discovery deadline is December 31, 2010. (Motions terminated: 28 , 34 , 35 , 38 , 41 ) (Arellano, S.)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents, Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/12/2010. (Motions to Compel 27 , 28 terminated) (Arellano, S.)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Strike Jury Demand 16 ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Request Jury Trial 17 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/2/10. (Hellings, J)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint and ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/10/2009. (Defendants Response to Complaint due: 1/13/2010) (Martin, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boparai v. Shinseki et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie Boparai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric K. Shinseki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?