Scott v. Palmer et al
Plaintiff: Floyd Scott
Defendant: J. Palmer, C. Love, M.H. Lopez and R.S. Rivera
Case Number: 1:2009cv01329
Filed: July 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Third 274 Motion for Transcripts at Government Expense signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/14/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER Addressing Notice 262 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/9/15. (Copy of this order served electronicly on 9th Circuit)(Martin-Gill, S)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 JUDGMENT dated *10/8/2015* in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff pursuant to order (Kusamura, W)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER (1) Discharging Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum Following Conclusion of Trial, (2), Notifying Prison Officials of Plaintiff's Los Angeles County Court Hearing Date of October 13, 2015, and (3) Directing Clerk's Office to Serve Order on Litigation Coordinators at VSP and CSP-Lancaster, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/8/15. (Verduzco, M)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER Requiring Production of Plaintiff for Trial on October 8, 2015, at 8:00A.M., signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/7/15. (Verduzco, M)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER Requiring Production of Plaintiff for Trial on October 7, 2015, at 8:15 A.M. signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/6/2015. (Jessen, A)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Parties' 222 Motion in Limine and 227 Motion in Limine, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/30/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER DENYING 234 Motion as MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/14/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Inmate Floyd Scott, CDCR #D-27081 for Trial in Courtroom #7, Sixth Floor, United States Courthouse, 2500 Tulare Street, Fresno, California on October 6, 2015, at 8:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/2/15. (Gonzalez, R)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER Denying Motion For Copy Of Ninth Circuit's Model Jury Instructions (Doc. 220 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/31/2015. (Fahrney, E)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 214 Plaintiff's Motion Regarding Copies of Additional Rules signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/24/2015. (Jessen, A)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER Denying 212 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/2/15. (Gonzalez, R)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER ADDRESSING 208 Request for Clarification, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/8/2015. (Marrujo, C)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER Setting Telephonic Trial Setting Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 04/13/15. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Gonzalez, R)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER Denying 195 Plaintiff's Motion for Expenses Incurred, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 04/13/15. (Gonzalez, R)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Pay Reasonable Expenses Incurred in the Amount of $467.50 and Staying Order in Light of Plaintiff's Indigency, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/6/15. (Verduzco, M)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER Addressing Notice Regarding Willingness but Inability to Compensate Officer to Take Depositions by Written Questions, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/5/15. (Verduzco, M)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER Addressing 183 Motion for Clarification, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/5/15. (Verduzco, M)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER STRIKING 180 Unsigned Filing signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/18/2014. (Jessen, A)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER ADDRESSING 135 MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/25/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Denying Motion And Directing Clerk's Office To Send Plaintiff Courtesy Copy Of Docket (Doc. 137 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/25/2013. (Fahrney, E)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/12/2013 deeming 11/19/2012 103 Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration reissued and denying 112 Motion for Sanctions. (Lundstrom, T)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER STRIKING 128 Surreply signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/28/2013. (Jessen, A)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER DENYING 127 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel as Premature signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/28/2013. (Jessen, A)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Overruling 120 Objection, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/22/13. (Gonzalez, R)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Granting 109 Motion for Reconsideration and Requiring Defendants to File an Opposition or a Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration Within Fifteen Days, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/21/13. Fifteen-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER DENYING Defendants' 105 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections, with Prejudice; ORDER (1) Adopting 102 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in Full, (2) DENYING 92 Defendants' Motion to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant, Issue a Prefiling Order, and Require Plaintiff to Furnish Security, and (3) DENYING Defendants' 97 Motion to Strike Surreply as MOOT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/21/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING 99 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Extending Deadlines signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/20/2012. Discovery Deadline: 3/29/2013; Pretrial Dispositive Motion Deadline: 4/29/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Striking Motion Seeking An Order Granting Reconsideration (Doc. 95 ), ORDER (1) Granting Motion For Reconsideration And Setting Aside Order Dismissing Claim As Barred By Favorable Termination Rule, And (2) Referring Matter Back To Magistrate Judge For Further Scheduling (Docs. 71 and 83 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/19/2012. (Fahrney, E)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' 92 Motion to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant and issue a pre-filing order against him be DENIED, with prejudice; Defendants' Motion for an order requiring Plaintiff to furni sh security be DENIED, with prejudice; Defandants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's surreply be DENIED as moot re 97 MOTION Strike Plaintiff's Surreply to Vexatious Litigant Motion; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/15/2012. Objections to F&R due by 12/20/2012 (Martin-Gill, S)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 84 Motion to Lift Stay and Continue with Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 05/02/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Denying 82 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/1/12. (Gonzalez, R)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER LIFTING STAYS 64 , 71 , 79 ; AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER 35 , 64 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/24/12. Deadline to Amend Pleadings - 07/30/12, Discovery Cut-Off Date - 10/30/2012, Dispositive Motions filed by 11/30/2012. (Gonzalez, R)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Striking 75 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/29/12. (Verduzco, M)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Striking Plaintiff's Untimely Objection 72 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/21/12. (Gonzalez, R)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Adopting 69 Findings and Recommendations in Full, Granting in Part and Denying in Part 40 Motion for Summary Judgment, and Staying Action Pending Settement Conference, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/19/12. (Gonzalez, R)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference Before the Honorable Jennifer L. Thurston, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/12/12. Settlement Conference set for 4/20/2012 at 12:00 PM at California State Prison, Los Angeles County (LAC), before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Gonzalez, R)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Defendants' 40 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT Be Granted in Part and Denied in Part, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/6/12. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Thirty-Day Objection Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING 50 Motion Rule 56 (D) ; ORDER GRANTING 42 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery; ORDER OVERRULING Objections, Disregarding Reply and Evidentiary Objections; ORDER GRANTING 60 Motion for Extension of Time within which to file a reply; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time as MOOT 54 , 55 , 62 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/07/2011. (Case Management Deadline: 1/10/2012) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER (1)Denying Motion to Compel and for Sanctions; (2) Granting Motion for Re-Service of Summary Judgment Motion and Denying Motion for Sanctions; (3) Requiring Defendants to Re-Serve Motion; (4) and Requiring Plaintiff to Comply With Order Filed September 2, 2011, 44 , 45 , 46 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/18/11. 45-Day Deadline to Respond to September 2, 2011 44 . (Gonzalez, R)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Partially Granting 42 Motion and Staying Discovery Pending Receipt of Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Stay and Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/2/11. Forty-Five Day Response Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Striking Motion (Doc. 38 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/15/2011. (Fahrney, E)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Striking 36 Reply to Answer, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/7/11. (Gonzalez, R)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Appointment of the Marshal to Effect Service and DENYING 24 Motion for Extension of Time as MOOT ; ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to Return Service Documents and Complaint Copies within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/20/2011. Service is appropriate for M.H. Lopez, J. Palmer, R.S. Rivera. Clerk to send plaintiff: 3 Summons, 3 USM-285 Forms. (Attachments: # 1 USM Instructions)(Sant Agata, S)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCREENING ORDER DISMISSING Due Process and Conspiracy Claims; DISMISSING Defendant Love; FINDING Service of Complaint Appropriate; and DIRECTING Plaintiff to Complete Service of Process within One-Hundred Twenty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/3/2011. Service Completed by 6/7/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Notice of Lawsuit, # 3 Waiver of Service, # 4 Rule 4)(Sant Agata, S)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to Either File Amended Complaint or Notify Court of Willingness to Proceed Only on Cognizable Excessive Force Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/20/2011. (Filing Deadline: 2/28/2011.) (Marrujo, C)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying 17 Plaintiff's Motion for an Order to Deliver his Property, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/20/11. (Verduzco, M)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/10/2010 denying 14 Motion as moot and directing clerk to send Plaintiff copy of Docket. (Lundstrom, T)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 11 , 12 Motion to Reopen this Case; ORDER for Clerk to REOPEN this Case and Correct the Record to Reflect PAYMENT OF FILING FEE signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/17/2010. CASE REOPENED. FILING FEE PAID. (Sant Agata, S)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING 1 Action, Without Prejudice, for Failure to Pay Filing Fee; ORDER for Clerk to Close Case signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/9/2009. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING 5 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER DENYING 2 Motion to Proceed In Fotma Pauperis; ORDER for Plaintiff to Pay $350.00 Filing Fee for this Action in Full within Thirty Days signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/16/2009. (Figueroa, O)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be Denied; Objections, if any, Due in 30 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/10/2009. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 9/14/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Palmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.H. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.S. Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?