Anderson v. Strauss Neibauer & Anderson APC Profit Sharing 401(K) Plan et al
Plaintiff: Thomas L. Anderson
Defendant: Strauss Neibauer & Anderson APC Profit Sharing 401(K) Plan, Douglas L Neibauer, Strauss Neibauer, A Professional Corporation and Total Benefit Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01446
Filed: August 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STIPULATION and ORDER for Entry of Judgment, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/4/2011. (Kusamura, W)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMORANDUM, DECISION and ORDER; RE Defendant's 112 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint in case NO: 1:10-cv-2195, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/18/2011. (Kusamura, W)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER on STIPULATION re new date submitting all parties' trial documents signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/5/2011. (Parties Trial Documents due by 4:00 p.m. on 1/14/2011) (Figueroa, O)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING in Part and DENYING in Part Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/27/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER CONSOLODATING CASES signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/2/2010. Lead Case is 1:09-cv-1446-OWW-DLB; Member Case is 1:10-cv-2195-OWW-DLB; MEMBER CASE CLOSED; All Future Filings to be made in Lead Case. (Sant Agata, S)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Courtroom Decorum. (Gaumnitz, R)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Memorandum Decision and Order Re: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceeding, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/5/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER that Total Benefit Services, Inc. be DISMISSED without Prejudice signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/8/2010. Total Benefit Services, Inc. terminated.(Sant Agata, S)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER to amend Scheudling Conference Order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/9/2010. (Kusamura, W)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint; ORDER signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/13/2009. (Answer Deadline: 10/9/2009) (Figueroa, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Strauss Neibauer & Anderson APC Profit Sharing 401(K) Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas L. Anderson
Represented By: Charles Mark Humbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strauss Neibauer & Anderson APC Profit Sharing 401(K) Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas L Neibauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strauss Neibauer, A Professional Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Benefit Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?