Doolin v. Wong
Petitioner: Keith Zon Doolin
Respondent: Robert K. Wong
Case Number: 1:2009cv01453
Filed: August 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER RE Petitioner's Pro Se Submission signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/4/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER Re: Petitioner's Pro Se Submission 205 ,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/24/18. (The Clerk is directed to return the instant pro se submission to Petitioner. Counsel for Petitioner are directed to provide him with a copy of this order) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER re 203 Petitioner's Pro Se Submission signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/13/2018. The Clerk is directed to return the instant pro se submission to Petitioner. Counsel for Petitioner are directed to provide him with a copy of this order. (Jessen, A)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER DISCONTINUING Status Reports During Exhaustion Stay, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/25/18. (Marrujo, C)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 187 Petitioner's Motion for Evidentiary Development signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/18/2017. (Jessen, A)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER Scheduling Petitioner's Motion for Evidentiary Development During Abeyance signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/08/2016. (Flores, E)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER RE: PETITIONER'S PRO SE SUBMISSION signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/2/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER GRANTING Withdrawal of Michael R. Levine as Counsel for Petitioner signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/4/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER APPOINTING Replacement CJA Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/28/2015. Attorney Pamala Sayasane and Robert Bryan for Petitioner Keith Zon Doolin Added. Attorney Michael Robert Levine Terminated. (Marrujo, C)
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER RE: (1) APPOINTMENT OF REPLACEMENT COUNSEL and (2) DISQUALIFICATION OF DISTRICT JUDGE re 164 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/24/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Quarterly Status Reports Regarding State Exhaustion Proceedings, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/09/14. Deadline: 7/22/2014 (Gonzalez, R)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER re: Appointment of Replacement Counsel signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/31/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER directing petitioner to file quarterly status reports pending completition of state exhaustion proceedings signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/21/2013. (Filing Deadline: 12/1/2013).(Lundstrom, T)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER REGARDING Ms. Milrod's Withdrawal as Counsel for Petitioner and DIRECTING Transfer of State Record to California Appellate Project, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/24/13: Ms. Milrod is DIRECTED to contact Michael Millman at CAP, at 415-495-0500, to make arrangements for transfer of the record and server. (Hellings, J)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER DENYING 145 Petitioner's Request to File Documents Under Seal signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/25/2013. (Jessen, A)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER DENYING Petitioner's 142 Request to File Status Report Under Seal signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/14/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Denying Petitioner's Motion For Additional Equitable Tolling; Granting Petitioner's Motion For Stay And Abeyance (Docs. 86 & 126 ), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/17/2012. (Fahrney, E)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Submitting Petitioner's Motions for Stay and Abeyance and for Additional Equitable Tolling; VACATING Hearing Set for January 9, 2012, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/6/12. (Hellings, J)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Granting Motion/Request For Sealing Declaration In Support Of Ex Parte Application (Doc. 80 ), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/29/2011. (Fahrney, E)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/11/2011 granting 67 Notice of Request to Seal Document(s) filed by Keith Zon Doolin. (Lundstrom, T)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting Reconsideration Of Petitioners Motion For Interim Equitable Tolling And Vacating Schedule For Further Equitable Tolling, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/17/2011. (Fahrney, E)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice Petitioner's 59 Motion for Interim Equitable Tolling and VACATING Hearing on July 6, 2011, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/2/2011. (Marrujo, C)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Amending Schedule For Petitioners Case Management And Budget Plan, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/18/2011. (Fahrney, E)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER to Extend Period of Equitable Tolling of Time to File Petition for Habeas Corpus, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/16/2010. (Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2011 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii) (Martin, S)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/1/2010 granting in part 25 Motion for Equitable Tolling. Doolin's federal habeas petition due by 4/27/2011. Joint Statement of Exhaustion by 5/27/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2011 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Lundstrom, T)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER setting Case Management Conference signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/17/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2010 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Lundstrom, T)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER re Briefing Schedule for Petitioner's Motion for Equitable Tolling of Time to File Petition for Habeas Corpus signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 08/18/2010. Opposition due by 8/27/2010. Reply due by 9/1/2010. (Flores, E)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Following Case Management Conference, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/7/2009. (Sondheim, M)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Appointing Counsel signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/9/2009. (Telephonic Case Management set for 12/3/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii)(Figueroa, O)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/19/2009 temporarily staying execution; granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and referring case to the Selection Board for Reccomendation of Counsel. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doolin v. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keith Zon Doolin
Represented By: Joseph Schlesinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert K. Wong
Represented By: Ward Allen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?