Angevine v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Paul W. Angevine
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2009cv01496
Filed: August 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Close this Action signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/14/2014. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REMANDING Case signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/17/2013. This case is remanded to the ALJ to complete an analysis of Plaintiff's mental impairments at step two consistent with the instructions outlined in the Memorandum issued by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals on October 16, 2013. (Marrujo, C)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Election to Revoke in Forma Pauperis Status Following Referral Notice of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeal; ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/30/11. (Verduzco, M)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal 24 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/22/11. Attorney Lawrence David Rohlfing terminated. (Verduzco, M)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/16/10. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER 15 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/8/2010. (Esteves, C)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER 12 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/7/2010. Response to Brief due 6/4/2010. (Esteves, C)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis 3 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/24/2009. (Scrivner, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angevine v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul W. Angevine
Represented By: Lawrence David Rohlfing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?