Exxonmobil Oil Corporation, a New York Corporation
Plaintiff: Exxonmobil Oil Corporation, a New York Corporation
Defendant: Nicoletti Oil, Inc., Dino J Nicoletti, Nicoletti Oil Company, John A Nicoletti and Does 1-100,Inclusive
Case Number: 1:2009cv01498
Filed: August 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:6901 Resource & Recovery Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF THE COURT TO CLOSE CASE; Voluntary Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/27/2017. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 STIPULATION and ORDER to CONTINUE the Status Conference currently set for 4/10/2017 to 5/22/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/5/2017. (Kusamura, W)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; STIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER - Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/10/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/13/2017. (Kusamura, W)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE AND SETTING A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE for 7/6/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/6/2016. (Kusamura, W)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Trial Date, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/28/2015. (Bench Trial previously set for 8/4/2015, is CONTINUED to 12/8/2015, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Parties to submit a status update apprising the Court of the status of the case on or before 11/30/2015.) (Gaumnitz, R)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Trial Date, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/5/2015. (Bench Trial previously set for 6/16/2015, is CONTINUED to 8/4/2015, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii.) (Gaumnitz, R)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Trial Date, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/5/2014. (Bench Trial previously set for 12/16/2014, has been CONTINUED to 3/24/2015, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii.)(Gaumnitz, R)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER Bench Trial set for 8/6/14 is continued to 8/12/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii.) signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/6/14. (Nazaroff, H)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER Clarifying Quashing of Deposition Subpoena. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/22/14. (Nazaroff, H)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER Continuing Trial Date And Extending Time To File Response To Motion In Limine, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/10/2014. (Bench Trial set for 7/29/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii., Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii) (Fahrney, E)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Order requiring Plaintiff to file a response to Defendant's renewed Motion in Limine and Motion to Strike Testimony of Joyce Rizzo, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 06/03/2014. Responses due by 6/13/2014. (Figueroa, O)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATION and ORDER re Business Records signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/27/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause and Rescheduling Pretrial Conference, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/9/2013. ( IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The order to show cause 95 is DISCHARGED; and 2. The pre-trial conference is reset to Monday, 1/14/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii.) (Gaumnitz, R)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Stipulation and ORDER Substituting Personal Representative for Defendant Dino J. Nicoletti, Deceased, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/9/12. Floretta Nicoletti added. (Verduzco, M)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims With Prejudice, Signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/27/2012. (Arellano, S.)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER DENYING 81 Motion FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/24/2012. (Kusamura, W)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER REFERRING 81 Pending Motion to Amend to the Magistrate Judge and Setting Briefing Schedule and ORDER VACATING Pretrial Conference, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/10/2012. Opposition to Motion to Amend due by 9/17/2012 at 1:00 p.m. Reply Brief due by 9/20/2012 at 1:00 p.m. Pretrial Conference RESET for 10/4/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Jessen, A)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Joint STIPULATION and ORDER to continue settlement conference, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/25/2012. (Settlement Conference previously set for 8/1/2012 has been CONTINUED to 9/5/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck) (Figueroa, O)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION and ORDER Continuing Expert Discovery Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/4/2012. (1. The deadline for completion of all discovery, including experts, is extended to 6/29/2012; 2. Settlement Conference previously set for 5/17/2012 has been CONTINUED to 8/1/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck.) (Gaumnitz, R)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION and ORDER Continuing Expert Discovery Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/9/2012. (Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 1/13/2012; Rebuttal or Supplemental Expert Disclosure Deadline: 3/8/2012; Discovery due by 5/8/2012)(Figueroa, O)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION and ORDER to Exclude Testimony of Dino J. Nicoletti, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/29/2011. (Gaumnitz, R)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Stipulation and ORDER re: 67 to Waive Privilege Logs, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/31/11. (Gonzalez, R)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/20/2011. (Gaumnitz, R)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION and ORDER Continuing Exchange Date, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/8/2010. (The date for the parties to exchange copies of all documents, electronically stored information, and tangible things that thedisclosing party has in its possession, custody, or control and may use to support its claims or defenses, unless the use would be solely for impeachment, is continued to January 31, 2011.) (Gaumnitz, R)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Exxonmobil's Second Amended Complaint, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/1/2010. (Kusamura, W)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION and ORDER regarding Scheduling Conference and Disclosure dates. Initial Scheduling Conference continued from 10/22/10 to 12/10/2010 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. Signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/29/10. (Vasquez, J)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM DECISION on Defendant's 36 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/22/2010. Formal Order due within 5 days; Amended Complaint due within 15 days. (Esteves, C)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER Continuing Scheduling Conference currently set for 10/15/2010 to 10/22/2010 at 08:15 AM signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/26/2010. (Figueroa, O)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Regarding Defendants' Motion To Dismiss First Amended Complaint 24 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/26/2010. ( Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiffs claim for negligence is GRANTED with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within fifteen (15) days of entry of this Order. Defendants shall file a response within fifteen (15) days of service of the amended complaint. )(Gaumnitz, R)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STANDING ORDER. (Gaumnitz, R)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING the continuance of the MOTION to DISMISS, document 13 , currently noticed for hearing on 12/7/2009, and CONTINUING it to 2/1/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger; opposition brief due 1/6/2010; reply brief due 1/25/2010; order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/30/2009. (Rooney, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Exxonmobil Oil Corporation, a New York Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exxonmobil Oil Corporation, a New York Corporation
Represented By: Allyson T Sakai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicoletti Oil, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dino J Nicoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicoletti Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A Nicoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100,Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?