Galvan v. Adams
Petitioner: Robert Gonzales Galvan
Respondent: Derral Adams
Case Number: 1:2009cv01872
Filed: October 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING Amended Petition for violation of the one-year statute of limitations and for lack of exhaustion 10 ; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to enter judgment and close case;ORDER DECLINING TO ISSUE CERTIFICATE OF APPEALability, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 07/21/2010. CASE CLOSED(Martin, S)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why the Amended Petition Should Not be Dismissed, Dismissing Ground Two signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/25/2010. Show Cause Response due by 8/2/2010. (Marrujo, C)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Petition Should Not Be Dismissed for Petitioner's Failure to Obey the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/2/2010. Show Cause Response due by 4/28/2010. (Sondheim, M)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Robert Gonzalez Galvan signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/24/2009. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galvan v. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Gonzales Galvan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Derral Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?