Ahdom v. Lopez et al
Plaintiff: Bilal Ahdom
Defendant: S. Lopez, M. Rashidi, M. Araich, S. Schaefer, M. Spaeth, M. Tolano, C. Chen, Y. Paik, Orthopedic Medical Group and California Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2009cv01874
Filed: October 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER Regarding In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal as to 243 USCA Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/24/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk's Office to Re-Serve March 8, 2018 232 Findings and Recommendations on Plaintiff; ORDER EXTENDING Deadline to File Objections to Findings and Recommendations, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/13/18. Fourteen Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to grant Defendants' Motion for terminating sanctions 224 and deny Plaintiff's Motion to compel 230 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/8/2018. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R's due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER VACATING Telephonic Status Conference; ORDER SETTING Telephonic Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Sanctions 224 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/30/18. (Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe.) (Marrujo, C)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/14/2017. Status Conference set for 2/8/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe.(Flores, E)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER GRANTING 216 Plaintiff's Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Discovery Responses Nunc Pro Tunc and DENYING Motion for Counsel Without Prejudice; ORDER GRANTING IN PART 217 Plaintiff's Fourth Motion for Extension of Time to File Discovery Responses; and ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/6/2017. Discovery Responses due within thirty (30) days. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/14/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Jessen, A)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER Requiring Parties to Notify Court Whether a Settlement Conference Would Be Beneficial, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/25/17: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendant Ashby's 170 Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents, Set One; Thirty Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/21/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendants' 173 Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents; Thirty-Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/16/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File a Reply Regarding Pending Discovery Motions; Thirty-Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/11/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations, Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motions to Take Judicial Notice, and Motion for TRO/Supplement to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/29/2016. 165 , 169 , 174 , 180 , 182 , 183 (Martin-Gill, S)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 179 Motion requesting pardon for mistake and Request for opportunity to file response to Defendants' discovery motions signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/14/2016. (Filing Deadline: 10/18/2016). (Lundstrom, T)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 183 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS RECOMMENDING DENIAL OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, MOTIONS TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF DOCUMENTS AND MOTION FOR TRO/SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION RE 165 , 169 , 174 , 180 , 182 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/14/2016. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due within 14-days. (Lundstrom, T)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order 176 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/26/16: The dispositive motion deadline of June 3, 2016 is VACATED. (Hellings, J)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to Respond to Motions to Compel, Motion to Determine Sufficiency of Answers or Objections, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/20/16. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER Requiring Defendant Ashby to Provide Expedient Response to Plaintiff's 165 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/18/2015. (Case Management Deadline: 12/30/2015) (Martin-Gill, S)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER Granting Defendant Ashby's Motion To Take Deposition Of Plaintiff Bilal Adhom, A Prisoner (ECF No. 159 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/7/2015. (Fahrney, E)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER Denying 158 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/30/15. (Gonzalez, R)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER Directing Parties to File Status Reports, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/26/15. 21-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER DENYING 149 Motion for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and for Certificate of Appealability; ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 94 , 95 and 96 Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint; ORDER REFERRING Action back to Magistrate Judge, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/9/15. (Defendants LOPEZ and SPAETH are DISMISSED from this action) (Martin-Gill, S)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel without Prejudice 134 ; ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File his Responses to the Pending Motions to Dismiss within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/12/15. (Verduzco, M)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 132 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Thirty Day Deadline); ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to Respond to Pending Motions to Dismiss (Sixty Day Deadline), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/3/14. (Marrujo, C)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to FILE Oppositions or Statements of Non-Opposition within Twenty-One Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/6/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Regarding In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/18/2014. (Marrujo, C)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Motions For Temporary Restraining Order And Requests For Judicial Notice (ECF Nos. 106 , 107 , 108 , 109 , 110 , 111 , 116 , 119 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/30/2014. (Fahrney, E)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 92 Plaintiff's Administrative Notice and Motion Requesting Clarity signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/23/2014. (Jessen, A)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Motions for Temporary Restraining Order and Requests for Judicial Notice, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/14/2014, referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen-Days. (Marrujo, C)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 106 , 107 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/10/14: Fourteen Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER DENYING Defendants' 67 Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories, and Requests for Documents without Prejudice to Refiling; ORDER DENYING Defendants' 68 Motion to Determine Sufficiency of Answers or Objections without Prejudice to Refiling signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/27/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER DENYING Defendant Ashby's 79 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint as MOOT signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/19/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Injunctive Relief (ECF No. 48 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/27/2013. (Fahrney, E)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Compel (ECF No. 59 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/25/2013. (Fahrney, E)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER re 77 Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/13/13. Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Vacating the Scheduling Order 39 ; ORDER Denying Defendant Ashby's Ex Parte Application to Vacate Deadlines in Discovery / Scheduling Order as Moot 39 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/3/13. (Verduzco, M)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant Ashby's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 53 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/1/13. Referred to Judge Ishii; 21-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER DENYING 60 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/24/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Extending Application of Discovery and Scheduling Order 39 to Defendants Araich and Shittu, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/15/12. Amended Unenumerated Rule 12(b) Motion Deadline: 1/4/2013. (Verduzco, M)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Denying 47 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/19/12. (Verduzco, M)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADOPTING 17 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissing Certain Claims and Defendants and ORDER DENYING 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Judicial Notice and 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/10/2012. (Jessen, A)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's Motion to Amend 21 ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motions to Amend and DISREGARDING The Second Amended Complaint 20 , 24 , 25 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/12/12. (Hellings, J)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissing Certain Claims and Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/14/2011, referred to Judge Ishii. Objections Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahdom v. Lopez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bilal Ahdom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Rashidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Araich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Spaeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Tolano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y. Paik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orthopedic Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?