Rocky Mountain Farmers Union et al v. Goldstene

Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Farmers Union, Redwood County Minnesota Corn and Soybeans Growers, Penny Newman Grain, Inc., Growth Energy and Renewable Fuels Association
Defendant: James N. Goldstene
Case Number: 1:2009cv02234
Filed: December 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Review Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER DISMISSING, as Moot, Plaintiffs' Claims Against the Original and 2012 Low Carbon Fuel Standards, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/1/19. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER on AFPM Plaintiff's Rule 41(a) 396 Motion to Dismiss Remaining Claim signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/14/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER FOR JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on June 28, 2017. (Munoz, I)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 389 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER re Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 378 & 380 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/15/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 370 MEMORANDUM Decision and ORDER re Plaintiffs' Motions to Amend ( 355 & 358 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/13/16. (Marrujo, C)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 13, 2016. (Munoz, I)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 347 Amended Memorandum Decision and Order re Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, clarifying parties in this litigation and to whom this order applies signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 28, 2015. (Munoz, I)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER RE 326 Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/13/2015. (Second Amended Complaint due by 9/18/2015).(Lundstrom, T)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 342 STIPULATION and ORDER re: Scheduling Conference. The August 18, 2015 Telephonic Scheduling Conference is hereby continued to October 16, 2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Judge McAuliffe. Defendants counsel sha ll make arrangements and have a one line conference call, with ALL counsel on the line, and shall initiate the call at the designated time. After all parties are on the line, the call should then be placed to Judge McAuliffe's chambers at (559)499-5789. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/10/2015. (Herman, H)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 340 STIPULATION and ORDER re Scheduling Conference Order: (no briefing need occur on Defendants stay motion until after the August 18, 2015 scheduling conference). signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/26/2015. (Herman, H)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER For Supplemental Briefing, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/1/2015. (Filing Deadline: 5/11/2015) (Fahrney, E)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER for Supplemental Briefing, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/24/15: Plaintiffs' brief ddl 4/3/2015; Defendants' brief ddl 4/15/2015. (Hellings, J)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Re Plaintiff's 313 Motion to Amend the Amended Complaint signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/10/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER For Supplemental Briefing, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/29/2014.(Filing Deadline: 11/12/2014, Responses due by 11/21/2014) (Fahrney, E)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 311 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/4/2014. Motions to Amend filed by 9/26/2014. Oppositions due by 10/10/2014. Replies due by 10/17/2014. Further Scheduling Conference set for 6/18/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Jessen, A)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 293 Joint STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Mandatory Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/7/2014. Scheduling Conference currently set for 5/14/2014 is CONTINUED to 8/28/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. (Martinez, A)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 277 AMENDED ORDER on Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction and Judgments Pending Appeal 273 and 274 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/23/2012. (Kusamura, W)
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER on 125 NPRA Plaintiffs' Summary Adjudication Motion; ORDERED Clerk of the Court to enter Judgment In Favor of the National Petrochemical Plaintiffs and Against Defendants on the dormant Commerce Clause claim, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/29/2011. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL: (1) UNREDACTED SUR-REPLY BRIEF; (2) UNREDACTED DECLARATION OF M. ELAINE MECKENSTOCK; (3) UNREDACTED SECOND DECLARATION OF MICHAEL WAUGH signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on June 8, 2011. (Lira, I)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO ENLARGE THE PAGE LIMIT FOR SUR-REPLY BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on June 3, 2011. (Lira, I)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE (Doc. 212) and EX PARTE MOTION APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE DISCOVERY AND PROVIDE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING (Doc. 233) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 23, 2011. (Lira, I)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY HOGAN (ECF NO. 128-1) IN SUPPORT OF NPRA PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 16, 2011. (Lira, I)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF GROWTH ENERGY'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION AND ORDER TO FILE UNREDACTED VERSION OF DECLARATION UNDER SEAL signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 11, 2011. (Lira, I)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER DENYING 162 Defendant and Defendant-Intervenors' Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/11/2011. (Hernandez, M)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO ENLARGE THE PAGE LIMIT FOR REPLY BRIEF signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 21, 2011. (Lira, I)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER to continue MOTION HEARING as to 162 DEFENDANT'S MOTION to COMPEL Further Responses: Motion Hearing is RESET from 3/18/2011 to 4/8/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/16/2011. (Hernandez, M)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting 188 Ex Parte Application to file certain documents under seal signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/14/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER ON AMICUS CURIAE REQUESTS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 10, 2011. (Lira, I)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 161 COURT'S RESPONSE TO FEBRUARY 8, 2011 STATUS REPORT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 10, 2011. (Lira, I)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 STIPULATION and ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 26, 2011. (Lira, I)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' AND INTERVENORS' FED.R.CIV.P. 56(d) MOTION 137 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 14, 2011. (Lira, I)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on December 22, 2010. (Lira, I)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER TO SET NEW BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND TO STAY OTHER DEADLINES signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on December 20, 2010. (Lira, I)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER GRANTING ROCKY MOUNTAIN PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on December 17, 2010. (Lira, I)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 134 CLARIFICATION REGARDING AMICUS CURIAE BRIEFING DEADLINE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on December 15, 2010. (Lira, I)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER TO ENLARGE PAGE LIMITS re 132 Motion signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/12/2010. (Jessen, A)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER GRANTING Rocky Mountain Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for an Order to File Under Seal Exhibits to Motion for Preliminary Injunction signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/2/2010. (Jessen, A)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING plaintiffs' request to exceed page limit requirements in re the filing of motions for summary judgment, documents 107 and 108 ; order signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/29/2010. (Rooney, M)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/15/2010. Lead Case is 1:09-cv-02234-LJO-DLB. Member Case is 1:10-cv-00163-LJO-DLB. Member Case Closed. ALL FUTURE FILINGS TO BE MADE IN LEAD CASE. (Jessen, A)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING 92 Environmental Defense Fund Leave to Intervene. The motion hearing set for 9/17/2010 at 9:00 am before Magistrate Judge Beck IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/15/2010. (Hernandez, M)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue the Scheduling Conference from 7/28/2010 to 9/9/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/22/2010. (Hernandez, M)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 23 , Signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on June 16, 2010. (Arellano, S.)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue the Scheduling Conference from 6/30/2010 to 7/28/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/7/2010. (Hernandez, M)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ON UNICA'S AMICUS CURIAE REQUEST (doc. 35) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 11, 2010. (Lira, I)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER TO ENLARGE PAGE LIMITS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 10, 2010. (Lira, I)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ON OREGON'S AMICUS CURIAE REQUEST signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 7, 2010. (Lira, I)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 BRIEFING ORDER FOR UNICA'S AMICUS CURIAE REQUEST signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 6, 2010. (Lira, I)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER to RELATE CASES signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/4/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 BRIEFING ORDER FOR AMICUS CURIAE REQUEST signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 4, 2010. (Lira, I)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Stipulation And ORDER Granting Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc., Sierra Club, And Conservation Law Foundation Leave To Intervene 17 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/19/2010. (Scrivner, E)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING OF DEFENDANT'S RESPONSIVE PLEADING - Defendant's responsive pleading shall be due on 3/31/2010. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/27/2010. (Hernandez, M)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER allowing Plaintiffs to file second amended complaint for declaratory and injunctive relief signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/26/2010. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocky Mountain Farmers Union et al v. Goldstene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Farmers Union
Represented By: John P. Kinsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redwood County Minnesota Corn and Soybeans Growers
Represented By: John P. Kinsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Newman Grain, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Kinsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Growth Energy
Represented By: John P. Kinsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renewable Fuels Association
Represented By: John P. Kinsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James N. Goldstene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?