Thomas v. Hartley
Petitioner: Dennis Thomas
Respondent: James Hartley
Case Number: 1:2009cv02252
Filed: December 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING Petitioner's 33 Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/4/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying 26 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/2/11. (Verduzco, M)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Regarding Petitioner's First Amended Petition 24 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/2/11. Referred to Judge O'Neill. (Verduzco, M)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ADOPTING 21 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Granting 18 Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to File Petitioner's First Amended Petition signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 02/02/2011. (Flores, E)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the 18 Motion to Dismiss be Granted based on Petitioner's Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief and that Petitioner be Granted Thirty (30) Days Leave to Amend the Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/6/2010. Referred to Judge Oliver W. Wanger. Objections to F&R due by 1/10/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed IFP 5 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/6/10. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dennis Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?