Shepard v. Tilton et al
Plaintiff: Lamont Shepard
Defendant: James E. Tilton, Derral G. Adams, R. Perez, A. Trevino, P. Garcia, L. A. Martinez, E. Dela Cruz, J. Soto, J. Campos and R. Castro
Case Number: 1:2010cv00023
Filed: January 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 JUDGMENT dated *5/7/2013* pursuant to order. (Sant Agata, S)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE and ORDER That Plaintiff Lamont Shepard, CDCR K-29682, is No Longer Needed as Witness in These Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/7/13. (Hellings, J)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER REQUIRING Production of Plaintiff for Trial on May 7, 2013 at 8:00 A.M., signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/6/13. (Hellings, J)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Denying Motion Informing The Court Of C.S.P. Corcoran Intentions And An Evidentiary Hearing (Doc. 97 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/30/2013. (Fahrney, E)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER & Writ Of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum To Transport Lamont Shepard, CDC #K-29682, Plaintiff Witness, Date: May 6, 2013, Time: 8:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/24/2013. (Fahrney, E)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/10/2013 requiring Plaintiff to file his Trial Exhibit List no later than April 18, 2013 re 94 Notice. (Filing Deadline: 4/18/2013). (Lundstrom, T)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Pretrial Deadlines Regarding Proposed Trial Exhibits signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/20/2013. (Flores, E)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/19/2013 directing Clerk's Office to mail Plaintiff a copy of 43 Exhibits. (Lundstrom, T)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER CONTINUING Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing 73 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/14/2013. (Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 3/18/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe.) (Marrujo, C)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 69 74 Motions for Settlement Conference without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/21/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 78 Motion for Summary Judgment Copies; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk's Office to Provide Plaintiff a Copy of his Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/14/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 76 Motion Informing the Court Plaintiff Indigent for Money for Witness signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/13/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to Respond to 69 , 74 Plaintiff's Motions for Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/30/2013. Defendants' Response due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/7/2013 denying 67 Motion to withdraw notice of appeal as moot. (Lundstrom, T)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER STRIKING 55 Plaintiff's Surreply and ORDER GRANTING 46 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/5/2012. (Jessen, A)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Denying 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/12/12. (Verduzco, M)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AMENDED SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - NOTICE and WARNING of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/18/2012. (Marrujo, C)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition 39 ; ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Electronically File Plaintiff's Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment 38 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/15/12. (Gonzalez, R)
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING 25 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/10/2011. (Jessen, A)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER, and Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment Notice, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/17/11. (Verduzco, M)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/24/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shepard v. Tilton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamont Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derral G. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. A. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Dela Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Campos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?