March 4, 2013 |
Filing
87
ORDER re: 84 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/1/2013. (Kusamura, W)
|
February 21, 2013 |
Filing
85
ORDER VACATING April 1, 2013 hearing date and order for expedited briefing, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/20/2013. (Sherwin Williams opposition or notice of non-opposition Deadline: 2/28/2013; Weco Reply due by 3/7/2013)(Figueroa, O)
|
January 11, 2013 |
Filing
83
ORDER regarding Defendant's 82 Request for Clarification, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/11/2013. (Figueroa, O)
|
January 3, 2013 |
Filing
81
ORDER DENYING 74 Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees; JUDGMENT AND COSTS signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/2/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
|
October 5, 2012 |
Filing
80
ORDER Vacating October 15, 2012 Hearing Date and Taking Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees Under Submission 74 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/4/12. (Gonzalez, R)
|
August 7, 2012 |
Filing
73
ORDER on Supplemental Motion For Summary Judgment 47 70 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/6/2012. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Summary judgment on the First Amended Complaints Sixth Cause of Action for breach of the implied contra ct of good faith and fair dealing is GRANTED in favor of Sherwin-Williams; 2. Summary judgment on the First Amended Cross-Complaints First Cause of Action is GRANTED in favor of Sherwin-Williams; 3. Sherwin-Williams shall file proof of its damages, f ees, costs, and interest at the legal rate under Ohio law, along with a proposed order within twenty (20) days of service of this order. Weco shall file its objections, if any, within ten (10) days of service of Sherwin-Williams proposed order. The Court will thereafter enter a final award of damages in favor of Sherwin-Williams; 4. The pretrial conference and trial dates are hereby VACATED.)(Gaumnitz, R)
|
June 1, 2012 |
Filing
69
ORDER Setting Supplemental Briefing Schedule On Summary Judgment And Continuing Pre-Trial Conference And Trial Dates, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/31/2012. (Defendant's Supplemental Deadline: 6/15/2012, Plaintiff's Reply Brie f due by 7/6/2012, Plaintiff's Opposition/Non-Opposition due by 6/29/2012, Jury Trial set for 10/10/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii, Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii)(Fahrney, E)
|
May 25, 2012 |
Filing
66
ORDER on motions for summary judgment. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/25/12. (Nazaroff, H)
|
May 14, 2012 |
Filing
65
ORDER CONTINUING Pretrial Conference, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/11/2012. Pretrial Conference RESET for 6/8/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Jessen, A)
|
May 8, 2012 |
Filing
63
ORDER VACATING the hearing on defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, document 47 , currently noticed for hearing on 5/14/2012, and deeming the matter suitable for decision without oral argument and taking it under submission as of said date; order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/8/2012. (Rooney, M)
|
April 24, 2012 |
Filing
54
ORDER DENYING 46 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration by the District Court of Magistrate Judge's Ruling signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/24/2012. (Jessen, A)
|
April 17, 2012 |
Filing
53
ORDER VACATING Hearing Date of April 23, 2012 and Taking Plaintiff's 46 Motion for Reconsideration Under Submission, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/17/2012. (Scheduled motion hearing date of 4/23/2012 is hereby VACATED, and the parties shall not appear at that time. As of 4/23/2012, the Court will take the matter under submission and will thereafter issue its decision.)(Gaumnitz, R)
|
October 19, 2011 |
Filing
42
STIPULATED Amendment to Scheduling Conference Order; ORDER - Discovery by 1/15/2012. Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 1/31/2012. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/28/2012. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE is continued from 12/13/2011 before Judge Snyder to May 3 , 2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 5/25/2012 at 08:30 AM and JURY TRIAL set for 7/9/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/18/2011. (Herman, H)
|
April 15, 2011 |
Filing
32
Courtroom Decorum. (Gaumnitz, R)
|
February 2, 2011 |
Filing
31
STIPULATED Confidentiality Agreement and Protective ORDER signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/1/2011. (Kusamura, W)
|
December 23, 2010 |
Filing
27
STIPULATION and ORDER to extend Defendant's time to file answer to First Amended Complaint signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/22/2010. ( Filing Deadline: 1/7/2011) (Figueroa, O)
|
November 22, 2010 |
Filing
24
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Re Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's First amended Complaint 21 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/22/2010. (Defendants motion to strike is DENIED; Plaintiffs first amended complaint is ORDERED FILED; Defendant shall have thirty (30) days to respond to the amended complaint.) (Gaumnitz, R)
|