Kessler v. Hornbeak

Petitioner: Kelly Alice Kessler
Respondent: Tina Hornbeak and Matthew Cate
Case Number: 1:2010cv00322
Filed: February 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denial of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/4/16. Referred to Judge O'Neill; 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER directing Clerk of Court to amend caption signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/15/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Supplemental Brief Addressing Legal Issues Omitted From the Answer, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/13/2012. 30-day deadline. (Jessen, A)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Deeming 40 Respondent's "Statement Regarding Evidentiary Hearing" to be a Request to Submit Opposition to the Motion for Evidentiary Hearing, and Opposition; and ORDER Permitting Petitioner to File a Reply to the Opposition No Later Than Thirty (30) Days After the Date of Service of This Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/28/2011. (Jessen, A)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING 36 Petitioner's Motion to Correct Exhibits signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/26/2011. (Jessen, A)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 15 Petitioner's Motion for Stay and Abeyance; ORDER STAYING the Action Pending Exhaustion of State Court Remedies; and ORDER DIRECTING Petitioner to File Periodic Status Reports, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/20/2010. CASE STAYED. Petitioner's First Status Report due by 1/25/2011. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kessler v. Hornbeak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tina Hornbeak
Represented By: Judy Kaida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kelly Alice Kessler
Represented By: Julie Schumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?