Tracy Taylor v. Hubbard et al
Plaintiff: Tracy Taylor
Defendant: Susan Hubbard, Kelly Harrington, Sheryl Wegman and T. Billings
Case Number: 1:2010cv00404
Filed: March 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER DISMISSING Action with Prejudice, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/23/14. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 125 Motion to Modify the Dispositive Motion Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/14/2014. (Marrujo, C)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER DENYING 121 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/14/2014. (Marrujo, C)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER DENYING 118 Plaintiff's Motion to Set Trial Date as Premature and GRANTING Plaintiff's Request for Submission of Motions for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/24/2014. (Jessen, A)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/21/2014 adopting 116 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 74 Motion to Dismiss.(Lundstrom, T)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 74 Motion to Dismiss; Objections Due within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/3/2013. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 10/7/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER REQUESTING Defendants to SUBMIT a Copy of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Filing signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/30/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to SUBMIT his Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Filing signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/19/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 109 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/15/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Adopting 106 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS DENYING Plaintiff's 29 39 Motions for Preliminary Injunctions and/or Protective Orders signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/14/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/25/2013 recommending that 29 , 39 MOTIONS for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION and/or PROTECTIVE ORDER be denied. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 4/18/2013.(Lundstrom, T)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (ECF No. 100 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/7/2013. (Fahrney, E)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 94 Request to Conduct Plaintiff's Deposition Via Videoconference signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/25/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 69 Motion for a Quick Decision on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/12/12. (Verduzco, M)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING 50 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/7/2012. (Marrujo, C)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Amend, DIRECTING Clerk's Office to File Lodged Second Amended Complaint, and ORDERING Defendants to File a Responsive Pleading and an Opposition OR Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions for Injunctive Relief 38 , 40 ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request for a Quick Decision 30 THIRTY-DAY DEADLINE, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/15/12. (Hellings, J)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Disregarding Plaintiff's Letter To The Court (ECF No. 45 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/25/2012. (Fahrney, E)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/2/2012. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading within thirty days of the order denying plaintiff's motion to amend or an order screening the second amended complaint. (Jessen, A)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying 36 Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/23/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants for Failure to State a Claim and ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 22 Plaintiff's Motion for a Copy of the Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/14/2011. Defendant Susan Hubbard terminated. (Jessen, A)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying 5 , 14 Motion for preliminary injunction / temporary restraining order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/30/2010. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tracy Taylor v. Hubbard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Wegman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Billings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?