Perridon v. Cate
Plaintiff: Steven Ray Perridon
Defendant: Matthew Cate, Anthony Hedgpeth, Community Education Centers of Trenton New Jersey, Paul Brown and Diane Clayton
Case Number: 1:2010cv00527
Filed: March 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING the Magistrate Judge's Amended Findings and Recommendations and Dismissing Complaint with Prejudice signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/14/2010. REMANDING CASE to Kern County Superior Court. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Withdrawing Findings and Recommendations dated 10/18/2010 10 , ORDER Denying as Moot the Motion for 30-day Extension of time 11 , and AMENDED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO REMAND signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/23/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Remand the Matter to the Kern County Superior Court signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/15/2010. Objections to F&R due by 11/1/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Cate's request for relief from responding to the complaint and a thirty day extension of time to respond to the complaint to commence upon issuance of screening order;ORDER requiring Defendant to consent to or decline Magistrate Judge jurisdiction within thirty days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 07/30/2010. (Consent or Decline Deadline: 9/3/2010) (Martin, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perridon v. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ray Perridon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Represented By: Matthew W. Kubicek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Hedgpeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Education Centers of Trenton New Jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?