Barboza v. Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Barboza
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. and Litton Loan Servicing LP
Case Number: 1:2010cv00559
Filed: March 31, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING Motion, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/30/10: Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED in its entirety without prejudice. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 33 and Directing Clerk of Court to Serve Copy on State Bar, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/18/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM DECISION Regarding Counsel's 37 Motion To Withdraw, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/1/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING Defendants' 29 Application for Clerk's Entry of Default against Plaintiff and Directing Defendants' to File Motion to Dimiss Pursuant to Rule 41(b), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for Failure to Comply with Court Order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/27/2010. (Figueroa, O)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Defendant Deutsche Bank Servicing, Inc.'s ("DBSI") and Litton Loan Servicing LP's ("Litton") motion to dismiss and motion to strike, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/2/2010. (Arellano, S.)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM DECISION GRANTING Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.'s and Litton Loan Servicing, LP's Motions to Dismiss and Deutsche Bank's Motion to Strike, documents 9 and 15 ; motions TERMINATED; defendants shall submit a form of order consistent with this Memorandum Decision within five (5) days of electronic service; order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/29/2010. (Rooney, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barboza v. Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Barboza
Represented By: Gary R. Lane, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Fredrick S. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litton Loan Servicing LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?