Samuels v. Ahlin et al
Plaintiff: Dougal Samuels
Defendant: Pam Ahlin, Department of Mental Health and Peter Bresler
Case Number: 1:2010cv00585
Filed: April 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANTING 147 and 148 Motion ; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to send a Copy of this Order to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/2/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Granting 126 Reconsideration, Dismissing on Qualified Immunity Grounds signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/15/2019. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to Terminate County Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/7/19. (Marrujo, C)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER RE: Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal of County Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/3/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER GRANTING State Defendants' 127 Motion to Stay, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/6/19. (Marrujo, C)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Following Initial Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/5/19. (Gonzalez, R)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER DISCHARGING 110 Order to Show Cause, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/14/18. (Marrujo, C)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying 103 Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/7/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying 111 Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel without prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/5/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER for Defendants to SHOW CAUSE why the Court Should not Enter their Default signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/30/2018. Show Cause Response due by 11/16/2018.(Flores, E)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's Objections to County Defendants' Request for Brief Extension of Time to File Answer 108 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/26/2018. (Hellings, J)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Granting County Defendants' 106 Request for Brief Extension of Time to File Answer signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/17/2018. (Flores, E)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER ADOPTING 69 & 100 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING 45 & 91 Motions to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/27/18. (Marrujo, C)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that that the County's 91 Motion to Dismiss be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 09/04/2018. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 9/24/2018.(Flores, E)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 03/14/2018. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER ADOPTING 87 Findings and Recommendations and Dismissing Certain Claims and Defendants, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/19/18. (Marrujo, C)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting in Part the County of Fresno's 53 Motion to Quash Service of Process or to Dismiss Plaintiff's Action in the Alternative signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/28/2017. (Flores, E)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that all claims and defendants be Dismissed, except for plaintiff's claims against defendants Pam Ahlin, Stephen Mayberg Brian Pacheco, Sal Quintero, Andreas Borgeas, Nathan Maqsiq, Buddy Mendes, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Audrey King, Brandon Price, Ron Withrow, Karin Hundal, Ron Howard, and Cynthia Radavasky for violation of Plaintiffs right to safe conditions under the Due Process Clause re 36 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Dougal Samuels ; referred to Judge Drozd,signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/26/2017. Objections to F&R due by 1/12/2018 (Martin-Gill, S)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff and Defendant to Submit Additional Information Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Submit the Actual Names of the Fresno County Board of Supervisors signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 09/26/2017. Twenty-One Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff an Extension of Time to File Objections to Findings and Recommendations, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/9/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's Claim Against Defendant Fresno County Board of Supervisors be Dismissed and that the County of Fresno's 53 Motion to Quash Service of Process be Granted signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 07/24/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd.(Flores, E)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER for Plaintiff to Notify the Court if it Wishes to Substitute Defendant(s) for the Fresno County Board of Supervisors Within Twenty-One (21) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/26/2017. (Jessen, A)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Setting Hearing on County of Fresno's Motion to Quash 53 ,signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 03/24/17. (Motion to Quash Hearing set for 4/14/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to File Reply 61 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 03/08/2017. (Motion to Dismiss is due April 10, 2017)(Martin-Gill, S)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's 59 Motion to Attach Page to Opposition signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/6/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to County of Fresno's Motion to Quash Service of Process or to Dismiss Plaintiff's Action in the Alternative within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 02/28/2017.(Flores, E)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 51 Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1-19/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER REQUESTING Clarification From Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/16/16. Thirty Day Deadline to Respond. (Marrujo, C)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING 27 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/25/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Dismissing Action, With Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted; ORDER for Clerk to Close Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/3/13. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Motion # 6 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/6/2010. (Scrivner, E)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING 2 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/8/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samuels v. Ahlin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dougal Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Ahlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Mental Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Bresler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?