General Electric Company, et al. v. Wilkins
Plaintiff: General Electric Company and GE Wind Energy, LLC
Defendant: Thomas Wilkins
Case Number: 1:2010cv00674
Filed: April 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 784 ORDER Treating "Notice" as Request for Reconsideration and DENYING Same 783 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/21/14. (Hellings, J)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 781 ORDER DENYING 780 Request for Copy of Judgment, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/19/2014. (Marrujo, C)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 778 ORDER To Relate Actions And To Reassign Magistrate Judge, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/7/2014. This Court ORDERS that the above-captioned action is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston with a new CASE NO. CV F 13-1943-LJO-JLT. All documents shall bear the new CASE NO. 1:13-cv-1943-LJO-JLT.(Fahrney, E)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 744 DECISION OF THE COURT; FINDINGS of FACT and CONCLUSIONS of LAW FOLLOWING BENCH TRIAL signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 29, 2012. (Munoz, I)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 730 ORDER ON INTERVENORS' MOTION TO INTRODUCE DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Doc. 724) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 8, 2012. (Munoz, I)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 723 NOTICE, STIPULATION, AND ORDER RE: ADMISSIBILITY signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 5, 2012. (Munoz, I)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 714 ORDER ON THE PARTIES MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Docs. 660, 662-667) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 2, 2012. (Munoz, I)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 702 ORDER DENYING INTERVENORS' AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS 588 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 1, 2012. (Munoz, I)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 661 ORDER SEALING DOCUMENTS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 29, 2012. E-mail Address for Approved Sealed Document (see L.R. 141): ApprovedSealed@caed.uscourts.gov (Munoz, I)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 654 ORDER ON CERTAIN ISSUES RAISED IN CONNECTION WITH THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 25, 2012. (Munoz, I)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 649 ORDER ON THE PARTIES' OBLIGATIONS PRIOR TO THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE THAT IS RESET FOR 10/26/2012 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 22, 2012. (Munoz, I)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 647 ORDER on the Parties 646 Request For Leave to File Trial Briefs, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/19/2012. (The parties may file trial briefs by no later than 10/26/2012. Responses to trial briefs will not be accepted.) (Gaumnitz, R)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 643 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY AND GE WIND ENERGY, LLCS REQUEST TO SEAL PORTIONS OF DISPUTED FACTS SECTION OF JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 18, 2012. E-mail Address for Approved Sealed Document (see L.R. 141): ApprovedSealed@caed.uscourts.gov (Munoz, I)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT (doc. 627) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 16, 2012. (Munoz, I)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 633 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs General Electric Company and GE Wind Energy, LLC's 631 Request to Seal Portions of Response to Motion For Expedited Hearing, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/15/2012. (IT IS ORDERED that GE may, pursuant to the Courts previous orders to seal, redact portions of its response to Mitsubishis and Mr. Wilkins Motion for an Expedited Hearing (Doc. No. 624) that reference privileged information. (See e.g., Doc. 372, 382, 447, 457, 586.) (Gaumnitz, R)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 629 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CERTAIN CLAIMS (doc. 610) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 12, 2012. (Munoz, I)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's General Electric Company and GE Wind Energy, LLC's Request to Seal Documents, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/9/12. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO DISSOLVE THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AS TO THE '565 PATENT AND ORDER VACATING THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 5, 2012 AND CONTINUING THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO MONDAY, OCTOBER 22, 2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 4, 2012. (Munoz, I)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Thomas Wilkins' Request for leave to file a reply to GE's opposition to defendantsEx Parte Application to dissolve preliminary injunction as to 565 patent, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/28/2012. (Kusamura, W)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER Sealing Documents as to 585 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/24/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER on Intervenor's Motoin for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/4/2012. (Marrujo, C)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER on Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER on Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/31/2012. (Kusamura, W)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER GRANTING Attorneys Fees to GE re: Motion for Sanctions 331 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/15/2012. (Hall, S)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION 465 475 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 2, 2012. Note: Unredacted Order will be served separately. (Munoz, I)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER to DISMISS With Prejudice Certain Claims, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/31/2012. (Marrujo, C)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 562 STIPULATION and ORDER re: Extension of Time for GE to File a Response to Mr. Wilkins' and Mitsubishi's Requests for Reconsideration, filed today by GE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 17, 2012. (Munoz, I)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER GRANTING GE's Request to File Attorney Billing Information Documents Under Seal 459 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/13/2012. (Hall, S)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 457 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING Second Request of Plaintiff, Defendant and Intervenor to Seal Additional Documents Related to Dispositive Motions 444 445 446 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/12/2012. (Hall, S)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 440 STIPULATION and ORDER regarding postponement of due date for filing of request for reconsideration signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/5/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 382 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING in Part Joint Request to Seal Documents 372 373 374 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/28/2012. (Hall, S)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER GRANTING in Part and DENYING in Part Motion for Sanctions 331 and ORDER DENYING Motion to Compel 328 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/22/2012. (Hall, S)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILINGS AND BRIEFING signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on June 18, 2012. (Munoz, I)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 341 AMENDED ORDER Granting In Part Joint Request to Seal Documents 333 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/31/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A) (Main Document 341 replaced on 5/31/2012) (Leon-Guerrero, A).
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER Granting In Part Joint Request to Seal Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/30/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER re: Discovery Dispute; ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT, Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/27/2012. (Hall, S)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 318 STIPULATION and ORDER re: Leave to Schedule Four Depositions signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/7/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER Granting 311 Request to Withdraw 279 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/23/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 314 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/22/2012. Case Management ddl: 3/7/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER Denying Mitsubishi's and Wilkins' request for Electronic Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/21/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER GRANTING Request to Seal Documents (Doc. 305 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/16/2012. (Arellano, S.)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER DENYING Defendant's Request to Seal Documents Without Prejudice (Doc. 294 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/14/2012. (Arellano, S.)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER GRANTING Ex Parte Request (Doc. 296 ) for Videotaping Within the Attorney's Conference Room Only, Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/13/2012. (Arellano, S.)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER Granting Request to Seal Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/8/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME 282 , and ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: MOTION TO COMPEL 279 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/2/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER Granting Request to Seal Documents Without Prejudice 280 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/1/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER Granting Request to Continue Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/19/2011. The Settlement Conference is RESET from 2/6/2012 to 3/28/2012 at 10:30 AM in Bakersfield at Truxtun (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Counsel to email settlement conference statements by 3/23/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO REUSE DISCOVERY PROPOUNDED IN AN ALLIED MATTER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/27/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER GRANTING IN PART STIPULATION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/17/2011. Discovery due by 2/23/2012. Expert disclosure by 3/15/2012. Rebuttal expert disclosures by 4/12/2012. Dispositive Motions filed by 6/22/2012, hearing by 8/7/2012. Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 5/11/2012, hearing by 6/8/2012. Jury Trial set for 11/16/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER RE: General Electronic Company and GE Wind Energy LLC's Motion to Dismiss 192 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/9/2011. (Kusamura, W)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER Re: Mid-Discovery Status signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/26/2011. (Figueroa, O)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER RE: 192 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/26/2011. (Kusamura, W)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER ON STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (Doc. 234 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/15/2011. (Arellano, S.)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MEMORANDUM DECISION re plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, documents 15 and 16 . The Court orders defendant Thomas Wilkins and those acting in concert with him, and those who have actual notice of this order, are enjoined and rest ricted from licensing or offering to license any interest in the technology described in the '565 and '985 patents, or from making any representation that Wilkins is presently legally entitled to license such technology, pending the entry of final judgment in this action or further order of the Court; order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/5/2011. (Rooney, M)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 187 AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 4/19/2011. (Mid Discovery Status Conference set for 7/14/2011 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, Discovery due by 2/29/2012. Disposi tive Motions filed by 2/8/2012, Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, Settlement Conference set for 2/8/2012 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield at Truxtun (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. Jury Trial set for 6/19/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger.) (Gaumnitz, R)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 176 [DRAFT] ORDER After Scheduling Conference, Signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/24/2011. Further Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2011 at 8:15 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Arellano, S.)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER DENYING defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint as Time-Barred, document 96 ; order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/15/2011. (Rooney, M)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Intervene, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/25/2011. (Kusamura, W)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING 125 Motion to Intervene, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/11/2011. (Mitsubishis motion to intervene is GRANTED, subject to its submission of a jurisdictional statement) (Gaumnitz, R)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER DENYING Defendant's 112 Motion For Reconsideration, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/20/2011. (Gaumnitz, R)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER GRANTING Pro Hac Vice Applications of Filiberto Agusti 128 , Seth Watkins 129 and Charles Cole 130 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/23/2010. (Marrujo, C)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER re: November 30, 2010 status conference signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/16/2010. (Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline: 1/14/2011; Joint Scheduling Statements due by : 2/10/2011; Initial Scheduling Conference ADVANCED to 2/18/2011 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger) (Figueroa, O)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Denying 84 Request For Leave To File Supplemental Opposition To GE's Motion For Preliminary Injunction, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/21/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DISMISSING complaint, without prejudice, and DIRECTING plaintiff to file an amended complaint by 10/14/2010; response to amended complaint due by 10/29/2010; order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/18/2010. (Rooney, M)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STANDING ORDER. (Gaumnitz, R)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/7/2010. (re: Videotaping Thomas Wilkins' Deposition.)(Kusamura, W)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re: October 1, 2010 Status Conference re: Dispute re: Temporary Restraining Order 50 . Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/5/2010. (Kusamura, W)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Re July 22 and 28, 2010 Scheduling Conferences Re Plaintiffs' and Defendant's Ex Parte Requests to Expedite The Hearing Dates on Their Respective Motions (Docket Nos. 23 and 27), signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/13/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/30/2010. ( 30 Motion for TRO set 8/6/2010 and Motion for 15 Preliminary Injunction are VACATED. 26 Motion to dismiss remains on calendar 9/27/2010 at 10:00AM.) (Gaumnitz, R)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/25/2010. (Defendant has until Friday, July 23, 2010 to respond to the Complaint.) (Gaumnitz, R)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Resposive Pleading to 7/23/2010, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/25/2010. (Kusamura, W)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER To RECUSE District Judge And To Reassign To Another District Judge, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/19/2010. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii for all further proceedings. The new case number is: 1:10-cv-674-AWI-JLT. (Scrivner, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Electric Company, et al. v. Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Eldredge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GE Wind Energy, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Eldredge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?