May 22, 2014 |
Filing
784
ORDER Treating "Notice" as Request for Reconsideration and DENYING Same 783 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/21/14. (Hellings, J)
|
May 19, 2014 |
Filing
781
ORDER DENYING 780 Request for Copy of Judgment, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/19/2014. (Marrujo, C)
|
January 7, 2014 |
Filing
778
ORDER To Relate Actions And To Reassign Magistrate Judge, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/7/2014. This Court ORDERS that the above-captioned action is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston with a new CASE NO. CV F 13-1943-LJO-JLT. All documents shall bear the new CASE NO. 1:13-cv-1943-LJO-JLT.(Fahrney, E)
|
November 29, 2012 |
Filing
744
DECISION OF THE COURT; FINDINGS of FACT and CONCLUSIONS of LAW FOLLOWING BENCH TRIAL signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 29, 2012. (Munoz, I)
|
November 8, 2012 |
Filing
730
ORDER ON INTERVENORS' MOTION TO INTRODUCE DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Doc. 724) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 8, 2012. (Munoz, I)
|
November 5, 2012 |
Filing
723
NOTICE, STIPULATION, AND ORDER RE: ADMISSIBILITY signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 5, 2012. (Munoz, I)
|
November 2, 2012 |
Filing
714
ORDER ON THE PARTIES MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Docs. 660, 662-667) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 2, 2012. (Munoz, I)
|
November 1, 2012 |
Filing
702
ORDER DENYING INTERVENORS' AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS 588 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 1, 2012. (Munoz, I)
|
October 29, 2012 |
Filing
661
ORDER SEALING DOCUMENTS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 29, 2012. E-mail Address for Approved Sealed Document (see L.R. 141): ApprovedSealed@caed.uscourts.gov (Munoz, I)
|
October 25, 2012 |
Filing
654
ORDER ON CERTAIN ISSUES RAISED IN CONNECTION WITH THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 25, 2012. (Munoz, I)
|
October 22, 2012 |
Filing
649
ORDER ON THE PARTIES' OBLIGATIONS PRIOR TO THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE THAT IS RESET FOR 10/26/2012 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 22, 2012. (Munoz, I)
|
October 19, 2012 |
Filing
647
ORDER on the Parties 646 Request For Leave to File Trial Briefs, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/19/2012. (The parties may file trial briefs by no later than 10/26/2012. Responses to trial briefs will not be accepted.) (Gaumnitz, R)
|
October 18, 2012 |
Filing
643
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY AND GE WIND ENERGY, LLCS REQUEST TO SEAL PORTIONS OF DISPUTED FACTS SECTION OF JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 18, 2012. E-mail Address for Approved Sealed Document (see L.R. 141): ApprovedSealed@caed.uscourts.gov (Munoz, I)
|
October 16, 2012 |
Filing
638
ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT (doc. 627) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 16, 2012. (Munoz, I)
|
October 15, 2012 |
Filing
633
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs General Electric Company and GE Wind Energy, LLC's 631 Request to Seal Portions of Response to Motion For Expedited Hearing, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/15/2012. (IT IS ORDERED that GE may, pursuant to the Courts previous orders to seal, redact portions of its response to Mitsubishis and Mr. Wilkins Motion for an Expedited Hearing (Doc. No. 624) that reference privileged information. (See e.g., Doc. 372, 382, 447, 457, 586.) (Gaumnitz, R)
|
October 12, 2012 |
Filing
629
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CERTAIN CLAIMS (doc. 610) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 12, 2012. (Munoz, I)
|
October 10, 2012 |
Filing
617
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's General Electric Company and GE Wind Energy, LLC's Request to Seal Documents, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/9/12. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
October 4, 2012 |
Filing
610
ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO DISSOLVE THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AS TO THE '565 PATENT AND ORDER VACATING THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 5, 2012 AND CONTINUING THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO MONDAY, OCTOBER 22, 2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 4, 2012. (Munoz, I)
|
September 28, 2012 |
Filing
602
ORDER GRANTING Defendant Thomas Wilkins' Request for leave to file a reply to GE's opposition to defendantsEx Parte Application to dissolve preliminary injunction as to 565 patent, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/28/2012. (Kusamura, W)
|
September 24, 2012 |
Filing
586
ORDER Sealing Documents as to 585 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/24/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
September 5, 2012 |
Filing
581
ORDER on Intervenor's Motoin for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/4/2012. (Marrujo, C)
|
August 31, 2012 |
Filing
580
ORDER on Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER on Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/31/2012. (Kusamura, W)
|
August 15, 2012 |
Filing
579
ORDER GRANTING Attorneys Fees to GE re: Motion for Sanctions 331 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/15/2012. (Hall, S)
|
August 2, 2012 |
Filing
575
ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION 465 475 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 2, 2012. Note: Unredacted Order will be served separately. (Munoz, I)
|
August 1, 2012 |
Filing
574
ORDER to DISMISS With Prejudice Certain Claims, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/31/2012. (Marrujo, C)
|
July 17, 2012 |
Filing
562
STIPULATION and ORDER re: Extension of Time for GE to File a Response to Mr. Wilkins' and Mitsubishi's Requests for Reconsideration, filed today by GE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 17, 2012. (Munoz, I)
|
July 13, 2012 |
Filing
460
ORDER GRANTING GE's Request to File Attorney Billing Information Documents Under Seal 459 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/13/2012. (Hall, S)
|
July 12, 2012 |
Filing
457
AMENDED ORDER GRANTING Second Request of Plaintiff, Defendant and Intervenor to Seal Additional Documents Related to Dispositive Motions 444 445 446 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/12/2012. (Hall, S)
|
July 5, 2012 |
Filing
440
STIPULATION and ORDER regarding postponement of due date for filing of request for reconsideration signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/5/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
|
June 28, 2012 |
Filing
382
AMENDED ORDER GRANTING in Part Joint Request to Seal Documents 372 373 374 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/28/2012. (Hall, S)
|
June 22, 2012 |
Filing
369
ORDER GRANTING in Part and DENYING in Part Motion for Sanctions 331 and ORDER DENYING Motion to Compel 328 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/22/2012. (Hall, S)
|
June 18, 2012 |
Filing
367
ORDER ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILINGS AND BRIEFING signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on June 18, 2012. (Munoz, I)
|
May 31, 2012 |
Filing
341
AMENDED ORDER Granting In Part Joint Request to Seal Documents 333 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/31/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A) (Main Document 341 replaced on 5/31/2012) (Leon-Guerrero, A).
|
May 30, 2012 |
Filing
335
ORDER Granting In Part Joint Request to Seal Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/30/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|
April 27, 2012 |
Filing
325
ORDER re: Discovery Dispute; ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT, Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/27/2012. (Hall, S)
|
March 7, 2012 |
Filing
318
STIPULATION and ORDER re: Leave to Schedule Four Depositions signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/7/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|
February 23, 2012 |
Filing
315
ORDER Granting 311 Request to Withdraw 279 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/23/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|
February 22, 2012 |
Filing
314
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/22/2012. Case Management ddl: 3/7/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|
February 21, 2012 |
Filing
312
ORDER Denying Mitsubishi's and Wilkins' request for Electronic Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/21/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|
February 16, 2012 |
Filing
306
ORDER GRANTING Request to Seal Documents (Doc. 305 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/16/2012. (Arellano, S.)
|
February 14, 2012 |
Filing
299
ORDER DENYING Defendant's Request to Seal Documents Without Prejudice (Doc. 294 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/14/2012. (Arellano, S.)
|
February 13, 2012 |
Filing
297
ORDER GRANTING Ex Parte Request (Doc. 296 ) for Videotaping Within the Attorney's Conference Room Only, Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/13/2012. (Arellano, S.)
|
February 8, 2012 |
Filing
292
ORDER Granting Request to Seal Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/8/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|
February 2, 2012 |
Filing
288
ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME 282 , and ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: MOTION TO COMPEL 279 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/2/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|
February 1, 2012 |
Filing
285
ORDER Granting Request to Seal Documents Without Prejudice 280 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/1/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|
January 19, 2012 |
Filing
267
ORDER Granting Request to Continue Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/19/2011. The Settlement Conference is RESET from 2/6/2012 to 3/28/2012 at 10:30 AM in Bakersfield at Truxtun (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Counsel to email settlement conference statements by 3/23/2012. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|
December 27, 2011 |
Filing
260
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO REUSE DISCOVERY PROPOUNDED IN AN ALLIED MATTER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/27/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|
October 17, 2011 |
Filing
251
ORDER GRANTING IN PART STIPULATION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/17/2011. Discovery due by 2/23/2012. Expert disclosure by 3/15/2012. Rebuttal expert disclosures by 4/12/2012. Dispositive Motions filed by 6/22/2012, hearing by 8/7/2012. Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 5/11/2012, hearing by 6/8/2012. Jury Trial set for 11/16/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|
August 9, 2011 |
Filing
242
ORDER RE: General Electronic Company and GE Wind Energy LLC's Motion to Dismiss 192 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/9/2011. (Kusamura, W)
|
July 27, 2011 |
Filing
238
ORDER Re: Mid-Discovery Status signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/26/2011. (Figueroa, O)
|
July 26, 2011 |
Filing
237
ORDER RE: 192 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/26/2011. (Kusamura, W)
|
July 15, 2011 |
Filing
236
ORDER ON STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (Doc. 234 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/15/2011. (Arellano, S.)
|
May 5, 2011 |
Filing
190
MEMORANDUM DECISION re plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, documents 15 and 16 . The Court orders defendant Thomas Wilkins and those acting in concert with him, and those who have actual notice of this order, are enjoined and rest ricted from licensing or offering to license any interest in the technology described in the '565 and '985 patents, or from making any representation that Wilkins is presently legally entitled to license such technology, pending the entry of final judgment in this action or further order of the Court; order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/5/2011. (Rooney, M)
|
April 20, 2011 |
Filing
187
AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 4/19/2011. (Mid Discovery Status Conference set for 7/14/2011 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, Discovery due by 2/29/2012. Disposi tive Motions filed by 2/8/2012, Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, Settlement Conference set for 2/8/2012 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield at Truxtun (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. Jury Trial set for 6/19/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger.) (Gaumnitz, R)
|
March 25, 2011 |
Filing
176
[DRAFT] ORDER After Scheduling Conference, Signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/24/2011. Further Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2011 at 8:15 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Arellano, S.)
|
March 15, 2011 |
Filing
173
ORDER DENYING defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint as Time-Barred, document 96 ; order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/15/2011. (Rooney, M)
|
March 1, 2011 |
Filing
166
ORDER GRANTING Motion to Intervene, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/25/2011. (Kusamura, W)
|
February 11, 2011 |
Filing
161
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING 125 Motion to Intervene, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/11/2011. (Mitsubishis motion to intervene is GRANTED, subject to its submission of a jurisdictional statement) (Gaumnitz, R)
|
January 21, 2011 |
Filing
158
ORDER DENYING Defendant's 112 Motion For Reconsideration, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/20/2011. (Gaumnitz, R)
|
December 23, 2010 |
Filing
137
ORDER GRANTING Pro Hac Vice Applications of Filiberto Agusti 128 , Seth Watkins 129 and Charles Cole 130 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/23/2010. (Marrujo, C)
|
December 20, 2010 |
Filing
124
ORDER re: November 30, 2010 status conference signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/16/2010. (Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline: 1/14/2011; Joint Scheduling Statements due by : 2/10/2011; Initial Scheduling Conference ADVANCED to 2/18/2011 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger) (Figueroa, O)
|
October 21, 2010 |
Filing
86
ORDER Denying 84 Request For Leave To File Supplemental Opposition To GE's Motion For Preliminary Injunction, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/21/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
|
October 18, 2010 |
Filing
82
ORDER DISMISSING complaint, without prejudice, and DIRECTING plaintiff to file an amended complaint by 10/14/2010; response to amended complaint due by 10/29/2010; order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/18/2010. (Rooney, M)
|
October 13, 2010 |
Filing
75
STANDING ORDER. (Gaumnitz, R)
|
October 8, 2010 |
Filing
59
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/7/2010. (re: Videotaping Thomas Wilkins' Deposition.)(Kusamura, W)
|
October 5, 2010 |
Filing
55
ORDER re: October 1, 2010 Status Conference re: Dispute re: Temporary Restraining Order 50 . Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/5/2010. (Kusamura, W)
|
August 16, 2010 |
Filing
39
ORDER Re July 22 and 28, 2010 Scheduling Conferences Re Plaintiffs' and Defendant's Ex Parte Requests to Expedite The Hearing Dates on Their Respective Motions (Docket Nos. 23 and 27), signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/13/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
|
July 30, 2010 |
Filing
38
STIPULATED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/30/2010. ( 30 Motion for TRO set 8/6/2010 and Motion for 15 Preliminary Injunction are VACATED. 26 Motion to dismiss remains on calendar 9/27/2010 at 10:00AM.) (Gaumnitz, R)
|
June 28, 2010 |
Filing
14
STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/25/2010. (Defendant has until Friday, July 23, 2010 to respond to the Complaint.) (Gaumnitz, R)
|
June 25, 2010 |
Filing
13
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Resposive Pleading to 7/23/2010, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/25/2010. (Kusamura, W)
|
April 20, 2010 |
Filing
8
ORDER To RECUSE District Judge And To Reassign To Another District Judge, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/19/2010. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii for all further proceedings. The new case number is: 1:10-cv-674-AWI-JLT. (Scrivner, E)
|