Carlson v. Hansen, et al.
Plaintiff: Thomas John Carlson
Defendant: R. Hansen, Igbinosa, G. Alexander, B. Howerton, J. Felton, Madrid, O'Brian, Licensed Vocational Nurses, J.A. Worth, R. Newton, I. Rodreguez, Alavara, G. Vega and Correctional Officers
Case Number: 1:2010cv00759
Filed: April 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER (1) Dismissing Action Pursuant to Stipulations of Voluntary Dismissal, with Prejudice, (2) Directing Clerk of Clerk to Close Case, and (3) Retaining Jurisdiction to Enforce Settlement Agreement Pending Fulfillment of Terms and Receipt of Declaration Attesting to Fulfillment of Terms re 96 , 97 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/21/15. CASE CLOSED.(Gonzalez, R)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Inmate Thomas Carlson, CDCR #P-16054 for Hearing on Thursday, April 2, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. before United States Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman at the U. S. District Court, Courtroom #25, 501 I Street, Sacramento, California, 95814, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 03/03/15. (Gonzalez, R)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Dismissing Claim Against Defendant Ikeni, with Prejudice, Pursuant to Parties' Stipulation, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/6/15. (Verduzco, M)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER DISMISSING Claims Against Defendants McCave, O'Brien and Garza, With Prejudice, Pursuant to Parties' Stipulation 87 - 89 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/6/14. (Hellings, J)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER DENYING 83 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/22/2014. (Marrujo, C)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER IMPOSING Service Costs on Defendant Ikeni and REQUIRING him to Reimburse USM $136.16 within thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/11/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER ADOPTING 73 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, DENYING 62 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss State Claim, Claims as Barred by Statute of Limitations and Requiring Defendants to File Answer within Twenty Days, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 08/03/2014. Case Management Deadline: 8/27/2014 (Martin-Gill, S)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Requiring Defendant Ikeni to SHOW CAUSE why Expense of Personal Service Should not be Taxed Against Him signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 07/08/2014. Show Cause Response due by 7/28/2014.(Flores, E)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING 58 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Vacating 35 Scheduling Order Pending Further Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/20/2013. (Marrujo, C)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, Directing Clerk's Office to File Third Amended Complaint, and Directing Defendants to File Response Within Thirty Days, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/5/13. (Gonzalez, R)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER STRIKING Duplicative Filings, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 06/10/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why Defendant: Alavara, should not be DISMISSED pursuant to Rule 4(M) as to 42 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 05/31/2013. (30) Day Deadline(Martin-Gill, S)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Denying 38 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/27/13. (Gonzalez, R)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING Motion Seeking Leave to Have Trial Witnesses Testify Via Declaration 20 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/3/12. (Hellings, J)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Doc. 3 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/3/2010. (Scrivner, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlson v. Hansen, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas John Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Igbinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Howerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Felton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madrid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Brian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Licensed Vocational Nurses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.A. Worth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Rodreguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alavara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?