Johnson v. Cate et al
Plaintiff: Garrison S. Johnson
Defendant: Mathew Cate and K. Harrington
Case Number: 1:2010cv00803
Filed: May 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER to DENY Plaintiff's 106 Motion to Proceed IFP and Motion to Appoint Expert Witness; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Grant Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Sur-Reply 99 , Grant In Part Defendant's Motion to Strike 93 , Deny Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Expert Witness's Decalaration 85 , and Grant Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/10/2015, referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Granting In Part Plaintiff's Motion To Stay Proceedings On Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment (ECF No. 95 ), Thirty (30) Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/2/2015. (Fahrney, E)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING the Parties' Request to Extend the Deadline to File Response to Interrogatories, Response to Request for Documents, and Motions to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/4/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER (1) DENYING Plaintiff's 52 56 Motion for Appointment of Expert Witness; (2) DENYING Plaintiff's 55 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories; (3) DENYING Plaintiff's 55 Request for Fees and Costs or Sanctions; (4) DE NYING Plaintiff's 56 Motion for Appointment of Counsel; (5) DISREGARDING Plaintiff's 56 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; (6) GRANTING Plaintiff's 57 Request to Modify the Court's Discovery and Scheduling Order; ( 7) GRANTING Plaintiff's 64 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel; (8) DENYING 65 Motion for Physical Examination; (9) GRANTING Plaintiff's 79 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and (10) GRANTING Plaintiff's 80 Request for Notification signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/8/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Request for Leave to Depose Plaintiff By Videoconference 53 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/9/14. (Hellings, J)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (ECF No. 43 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/22/2013. (Fahrney, E)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DISREGARDING 43 Motion to Proceed IFP as MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/19/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION, DENYING Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 29 , 36 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/30/13. (Hellings, J)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Defendant's 29 Motion to Dismiss; Objections Due within Fourteen Days signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/31/2013. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 8/19/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/12/2013 disregarding 33 Motion to Proceed IFP as moot. (Lundstrom, T)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Adopting 20 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS In Part and DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/20/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations 18 Denying Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order 15 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/3/12. (Verduzco, M)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Finding That Plaintiff States Cognizable Claims and Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/24/2012, referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief be DENIED re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/4/2012. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Screening signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/9/2011. (Jessen, A)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 Motion for the court to rescind order and vacating 9 Order granting Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/10/2010. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Cate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrison S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?