Pac-West Telecomm, Inc. v. AT&T Communications of California, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pac-West Telecomm, Inc.
Defendant: AT&T Communications of California, Inc. and AT&T Corp.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00968
Filed: May 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/22/2010. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/07/2010. (Discovery due by 7/1/2011, Motions filed by 8/1/2011, Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 7/20/2011, Bench Trial set for 12/13/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Jud ge Oliver W. Wanger, In Court Hearing set for 8/26/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck, Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, Settlement Conference set for 7/5/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin, Mid-Discovery Status Hearing set for 02/18/2011 at 8:15 am in Courtroom 3 before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, and Mid-Discovery Joint Status Report due: 02/14/2011) (Martin, S)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Randomly Reassign this action to another District Court Judge; The new case number is: 1:10-cv-00968 OWW GSA, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 06/1/2010. (Martin, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pac-West Telecomm, Inc. v. AT&T Communications of California, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pac-West Telecomm, Inc.
Represented By: David G Bayles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Communications of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?