March 27, 2012 |
Filing
84
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Complaint be Dismissed. Matter referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days of service of this recommendation; signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/27/2012. (Timken, A)
|
March 1, 2012 |
Filing
83
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Court ORDERS plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, within 21 days of the issuance of this order, explaining why this action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the Court's orders. The Court further ORDERS the Scheduling Conference currently set for 3/6/2012 VACATED. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/29/2012. (Rooney, M)
|
January 19, 2012 |
Filing
81
ORDER CONTINUING the Scheduling Conference currently set for 1/24/2012, to 3/6/2012, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, and requiring Plaintiff to contact Defendant's counsel to meet and confer regarding the joint scheduling report and to provide contact information. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/18/2012. (Timken, A)
|
October 27, 2011 |
Filing
65
ORDER DENYING without prejudice 58 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of record for Plaintiff. The November 2, 2011, hearing scheduled on this motion is VACATED, the parties do not need to appear. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/26/2011. (Timken, A)
|
September 8, 2011 |
Filing
57
STIPULATION and ORDER amending the scheduling order. Non expert discovery due by no later than 11/30/2011. Expert disclosures due by no later than 11/30/2011. Supplemental expert disclosures due by no later than 12/15/2011. Expert discovery due b y no later than 12/30/2011. Non-dispositive motions to be filed by no later than 11/30/2011. Dispositive motions to be filed by no later than 1/16/2012. The Settlement Conference currently set for 10/27/2011 is RESET to 2/2/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/8/2011. (Timken, A)
|
August 11, 2011 |
Filing
55
STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER authorizing limited disclosure of confidential materials signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/10/2011. (Timken, A)
|
August 2, 2011 |
Filing
53
ORDER on request for stipulated protective order. The parties shall refile a revised stipulation and proposed order for a protective order that complies with L.R. 141.1(c) and email a conforming copy of the stipulation and proposed order to skoorders @caed.uscourts.gov; and if, upon further consideration, the parties determine that there is no need for a Court order due to a private agreement between them, they shall withdraw their request for a protective order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/2/2011. (Timken, A)
|
March 22, 2011 |
Filing
50
ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT AND TO AMEND COMPLAINT 45 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 22, 2011. Motion Hearing currently set for March 28, 2011 is VACATED. (Lira, I)
|
January 18, 2011 |
Filing
40
ORDER ON RECONSIDERATION MOTION signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 18, 2011. (Lira, I)
|
December 9, 2010 |
Filing
31
ORDER on Defendants' 24 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/8/2010. Stephen Taylor, City Of Fresno and County of Fresno terminated.(Sant Agata, S)
|
November 15, 2010 |
Filing
26
STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 15, 2010. (Lira, I)
|
October 8, 2010 |
Filing
22
ORDER ON DEFENDANT FRESNO COUNTY'S F.R.Civ.P 12 MOTION TO DISMISS 16 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 8, 2010. Motion Hearing currently set for 10/14/2010 has been VACATED. (Lira, I)
|
September 8, 2010 |
Filing
15
STIPULATION and ORDER to extend Defendant County of Fresno's time to respond to or answer Plaintiff's complaint. Defendant COUNTY OF FRESNO shall have until September 16, 2010, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/8/2010. (Timken, A)
|
September 1, 2010 |
Filing
9
STIPULATION and ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on September 1, 2010. Motion Hearing currently set for September 16, 2010 before Judge O'Neill is VACATED. Scheduling Conference currently set for 9/23/2010 has been CONTINUED to 12/2/2010 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Lira, I)
|