Morales et al v. City of Delano et al
Plaintiff: Manuela Cancino Morales and Ruben Alejandro Morales
Defendant: City of Delano, Delano Police Department, Mark DeRosia, Jose Mejia, Shaun Manuele and County of Kern
Case Number: 1:2010cv01203
Filed: June 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 220 STIPULATED ORDER of Dismissal of Action with Prejudice, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/19/12. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER re: 214 Motion for Approval of Compromise of Minor Plaintiff R.A.M.'s Claims, signed by Senior Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/9/12. (Verduzco, M)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER On Parties' Objections To Court's Pretrial Order And Amendments Thereto (Doc#'s 150 and 151 ), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/18/2012. (Fahrney, E)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/14/12; RULES OF CONDUCT. Motion in Limine Hearing set for 10/15/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 10/30/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Verduzco, M)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Join Indispensable Party 104 , 105 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/10/12. The hearing date of May 15, 2012, previously set for hearing of Defendants' Motions is hereby VACATED. (Verduzco, M)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Continuing Date of Hearing on Defendants' Motions on Standing and Failure to Join Necessary Parties, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/3/2012. (Motion Hearing previously set for 5/7/2012 has been CONTINUED to 5/15/2012 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii.) (Gaumnitz, R)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM, OPINION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/22/2012 following additional briefing on Plaintiffs' motion for summary adjudication on the issue of fourth amendment violation arising from unlawful entry. (Lundstrom, T)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 SCHEDULING ORDER pursuant to the Status Conference of 2/16/2012. The Court VACATES the Jury Trial currently set for 3/12/2012 and any other dates associated therewith. The Court further sets the following schedule: further briefs in s upport of, or in opposition to, plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Adjudication on the issue of plaintiffs' claim for fourth amendment violation shall be simultaneously filed by 3/2/2012 with any responsive briefs, also simulataneously filed, b y 3/9/2012. A Pretrial Conference is set for 3/23/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii with a joint pretrial statement due by 3/22/2012. The Motions in Limine/Trial Confirmation Hearing is set for 4/30/2012 at 1: 30 PM before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Any further motions in limine are to be filed by 4/3/2012; responses to same due by 4/17/2012; and any replies due by 4/24/2012. The Jury Trial is set for 5/8/2012 at 8:30 AM before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii; order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/17/2012. (Rooney, M)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Memorandum Opinion and ORDER GRANTING in Part and DENYING in Part the Parties' Cross Motions for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/14/2012. (Figueroa, O)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER FURTHER CONTINUING the Pretrial Conference currently set for 2/9/2012 at 8:30 AM before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii, and CONTINUING it to 2/16/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii; order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/8/2012. (Rooney, M)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Continuing pretrial conference from 2/3/12 to 2/9/12 at 8:30 a.m. before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii in courtroom #2. It is a mandatory appearance by trial counsel. Telephonic appearances are not allowed. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/1/12. (Nazaroff, H)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER to Continue Pre-Trial Conference, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/21/2011. (Pretrial Conference previously set for 1/20/2012 is CONTINUED to 2/3/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii.)(Gaumnitz, R)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/15/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting In Part Request to Seal 72 , ORDER to Plaintiffs to SHOW CAUSE, and ORDER to Defendants to Lodge signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/4/2011. Show Cause Response due by 11/18/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER VACATING the 11/7/2011 hearing on the pending Motions for Summary Judgment, documents 42 and 45 , and taking the motions under submission as of said date; order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/1/2011. (Rooney, M)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/17/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING 37 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/26/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Stipulated Protective Ordersigned by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/23/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER to United States Marshal for Service of Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 08/18/2010. (Flores, E)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/23/2010. 2nd Amended Complaint due by 8/7/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting 4 Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem, ORDER Granting 3 Motion to Proceed IFP, and ORDER Dismissing Complaint With Leave To Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/7/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales et al v. City of Delano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuela Cancino Morales
Represented By: Lanny Mark Tron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Alejandro Morales
Represented By: Lanny Mark Tron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Delano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delano Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark DeRosia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?