Williams v. Anderson
Plaintiff: Sylvester Williams
Defendant: R. Anderson
Case Number: 1:2010cv01250
Filed: July 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Ex Parte 166 Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/30/2016. (Flores, E)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER DENYING 162 Motion to Stop the Return Check Fee and Any Additional Fees, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/13/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, Writ of Mandate, Motion for Discovery, and Motion for Response by District Judge signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/25/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER Denying 150 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/10/15. (Gonzalez, R)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION, with Prejudice, pursuant to Parties' Stipulation, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/3/15. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Vacating Deadlines for Exchange and Filing of Trial Exhibits set Forth in Court's April 8, 2015, and Re-Setting Deadlines signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/23/2015. (Flores, E)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER VACATING August 25, 2015, Trial Date and RE-SETTING New Trial Date signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/17/2015. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 9/11/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge S tanley A. Boone; Telephonic Motions in Limine Hearing set for 10/28/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; Jury Trial set for 11/17/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Sant Agata, S)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk's Office to RETURN Plaintiff's Offer of Settlement Lodged by the Court on July 6, 2015, and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Serve Copy of Filing on Deputy Attorney General, Kelli Hammond signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/12/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Third and Fourth Requests for Court Settlement and Denying Request for Court Order Relating to Discovery, re 132 , 133 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/27/15. (Gonzalez, R)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Second 128 Request for Settlement Conference, without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/13/2015. (Flores, E)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 126 Motion for Perjury Charges Against Defendant, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/7/2015. (Marrujo, C)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Denying 123 Plaintiff's Fourth Motion for Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/23/15. (Gonzalez, R)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/07/2015.(Jury Trial set for 8/25/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; Motion In Limine Hearing set for 8/11/2015 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 7/17/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 115 116 Request for Telephonic Conference with Defense Counsel Regarding Settlement Negotiations signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/01/2015. (Flores, E)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Setting Telephonic Conference Call, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/12/15. Telephonic Scheduling Hearing set for 4/7/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Gonzalez, R)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Denying Motions for Summary Judgment, Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, and Motion for Ruling on Motions for Summary Judgment, re 55 , 56 , 100 , 101 and 108 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/09/15. (Gonzalez, R)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Application for Copy of Court Docket 87 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/5/15. (Verduzco, M)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DIRECTING Defendant to File Opposition OR Statement of No Opposition to Plaintiff's 83 Motion to Compel and 84 Motion for Subpoena Within Fifteen Days From the Date of Service of This Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/2/2014. (Marrujo, C)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 80 Request to Withdraw Discovery Motion as Moot signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/29/14. (Gonzalez, R)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Disregarding Plaintiff's 74 Notice Relating to Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/12/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Appointment Of Counsel And/Or Assistance From The Court Regarding Falsification Of Swon Declarations (ECF No. 72 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/2/2014. (Fahrney, E)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT Plaintiff's 65 Motion to Withdraw Defendant's Right to File Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/12/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER REGARDING Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Request for Extension of Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/1/2014. OVERRULED. (Sant Agata, S)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Request to Modify Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/30/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 51 Motion to Withdraw Pending 49 Motion to Compel and 50 Extension of Discovery Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/27/14. (Verduzco, M)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Without Prejudice (ECF No. 47 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/18/2014. (Fahrney, E)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Phone Call Privileges 43 and Directing Clerk of Court to Forward Plaintiff a Copy of Docket Sheet 44 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/9/14. (Verduzco, M)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 39 Motion for Preliminary Injunction signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/4/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Assigning Action to Magistrate Judge Boone; New Case Number is: 1:10-cv-1250 SAB (PC), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/27/13. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion To Withdraw Motion For Default Judgment (ECF No. 27 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/20/2013. (Fahrney, E)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 24 Motion for Settlement Conference AS PREMATURE, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/08/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 16 Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 01/08/2013. (Flores, E)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel and 11 Motion for Early Settlement signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 10/13/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvester Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?