Lopez et al v. HSBC Bank USA et al

Petitioner: Olga Lopez
Respondent: HSBC Bank USA, National Association and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2010cv01332
Filed: July 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING 6 AMENDED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL; ORDER DENYING 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; ORDER REMANDING CASE to Kern County Superior Court; and ORDER DISMISSING Matter With Prejudice, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/23/2010. Copy of remand order sent to Kern County Superior Court. (Jessen, A)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/5/2010. Objections to F&R due by 8/20/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is Denied; the Motion to Remove the Matter is Denied; the Matter is Dismissed with Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/30/2010. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 8/13/2010. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez et al v. HSBC Bank USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Olga Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HSBC Bank USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?