Reed v. Kang, et al.
Plaintiff: Carol Y. Reed
Defendant: Ho Kang, Toor and Johnson
Case Number: 1:2010cv01337
Filed: July 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DISMISSING CASE based on Plaintiff's failure to state any claims upon which relief may be granted under 1983; ORDER for Clerk of the Court to Close the Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 03/26/2012. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER STRIKING 20 Motion for Appointment of Counsel; ORDER DENIED AS MOOT 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 10/08/2010. (Martin, S)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING 20 Motion to Appoint Counsel WITHOUT PREJUDICE, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 10/08/2010. (Martin, S)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 17 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 9/30/10: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 16 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 9/28/10: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 14 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 9/20/10: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying Motion for Appointment of Counsel 7 , 8 , 9 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/9/2010. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Kang, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Y. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ho Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?