Rodriguez et al v. City of Modesto et al
Plaintiff: Miguel Rodriguez, Charisse Fernandez and Adrian Alizaga
Defendant: City of Modesto, Roy Wasden, Ron Cloward, John Buehler, Jeff Spruill, James Murphy, Casey Graham, Florencio Costales, Ronny Ziya and Mark Fontes
Case Number: 1:2010cv01370
Filed: July 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER on Stipulation and Order for Dismissal of All Claims, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/24/15. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' 63 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 04/08/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER RE REQUEST TO CONTINUE FOR THE OPPOSITION DUE DATE RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 19, 2015. (Munoz, I)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 42 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on December 9, 2013. (Munoz, I)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER TO FILE RESPONSE TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Doc. 40) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on September 26, 2013. (Munoz, I)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER to File Second Amended Complaint re 38 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/28/13. Amended Complaint due by 9/25/2013. (Gonzalez, R)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion for Relief of Judgment as to 27 USCA Order, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/06/2011. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TO FILE PAPERS TO OPPOSE/RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' F.R.CIV.P. 60(b) MOTION (doc. 27) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 17, 2011. (Lira, I)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER to DENY Without Prejudice Plaintiff's 25 F.R.Civ.P. 60(b) Motion, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/11/201. (Marrujo, C)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JUDGMENT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 24, 2011. (Lira, I)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING 18 Motion to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE; Judgment against Plaintiffs and In Favor of Defendants, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/06/2011.CASE CLOSED (Martin, S)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' F.R.Civ.P. 12 MOTION TO DISMISS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 23, 2010. Motion Hearing currently set for December 6, 2010 is VACATED. (Lira, I)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez et al v. City of Modesto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Rodriguez
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charisse Fernandez
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Alizaga
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Modesto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Wasden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Cloward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Buehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Spruill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florencio Costales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronny Ziya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Fontes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?