Whitley v. Lopez et al
Plaintiff: David E. Whitley
Defendant: Lopez, Harrington and M. Cabrera
Case Number: 1:2010cv01499
Filed: August 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Defendants Cabrera and Herrera's 20 Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 02/28/2014. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 3/20/2014. (Flores, E)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 21 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/20/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/19/2012 discharging 9 Order to Show Cause. (Lundstrom, T)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed For Failure to Comply with Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/16/11. Plaintiff must file Amended Complaint by 1/20/2012. (Verduzco, M)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING Plaintiff's Complaint For Failure to State a Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/25/2011. Amended Complaint Due November 28, 2011. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitley v. Lopez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E. Whitley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?