Porter v. Wegman et al
Plaintiff: Brian Ellis Porter
Defendant: Cherylee Wegman, Matthew Cate, Ben Rice, Bruce Slavin, Barry Smith, Kelly Harrington, Reba Grissom, Tom Arlitz, Mark Howard and - Whitehead
Case Number: 1:2010cv01500
Filed: August 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 JUDGMENT dated *08/30/2017* pursuant to order (Martin-Gill, S)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 NOTICE AND ORDER that Plaintiff Brian Ellis Porter, CDCR# P-88509, is no longer needed as a witness in these proceedings and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/30/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER Denying 192 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/19/17. (Gonzalez, R)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Defendant's Combined 172 Motion in Limine; ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's 175 Opposition to Expert Disclosure and Combined Motion in Limine; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 188 Motion to Amend the Amended Pretrial Order as MOOT, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/17/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's 180 Objections to Pretrial Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/7/17. (Gonzalez, R)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 183 Motion for Extension of Time or Excuse for Late Filing as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/4/17. (Gonzalez, R)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER Directing Service of Subpoena on Witness by the United States Marshal without Prepayment of Costs signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/03/2017. (Flores, E)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/27/2017. Motions In Limine Hearing set for 8/14/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe; Jury Trial set for 8/29/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Flores, E)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER Denying 163 Motion to Amend Plaintiff's Pretrial Statement, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/27/17. (Gonzalez, R)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 174 Notice or Update of Witness Information, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/25/17. Deadline to Submit Witness Fees: 8/4/2017. (Gonzalez, R)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER Denying Inmate Perry's 171 Motion to be Excluded as Plaintiff's Witness as Moot signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/19/2017. (Flores, E)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/11/2017. (Flores, E)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Name(s) and Locations of Unincarcerated Witnesses and Pretrial Statement 153 ; ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/26/17: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/5/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Hellings, J)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/14/17: Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 6/20/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe; Jury Trial set for 8/29/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe; Names & Locations of Unicarcerated Witnesses ddl 5/9/2017; Plaintiff's Pretrial Statement & Motion for Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses ddl 5/23/2017; Defendant's Pretrial Statement ddl 6/6/2017 and Money Orders ddl 6/20/2017. (Hellings, J)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER to Recaption Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/6/17. (Gonzalez, R)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Defendant's 103 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 05/14/2015. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 6/16/2015.(Flores, E)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Granting Defendant's 116 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order to Allow Supplemental Briefing in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/16/15. (Verduzco, M)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER DENYING 109 Motion to Compel; ORDER DENYING 110 Motion to Stay, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/17/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER DENYING 114 Motion for Clarification and Motion to Intervene by George Hamilton, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/14/14. (Copy of this order forwarded to George Hamilton at Kern Valley State Prison) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER DENYING 88 , 91 , 93 and 94 Motion for Reconsideration to Join as Co-Plaintiffs and DIRECTING Clerk's Office to Serve Courtesy Copy of Order on Inmate George Hamilton, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/11/14. (Served copy of this order on George Hamilton K-54885, Kern Valley State Prison) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting Defendant's 95 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 04/11/14. (Gonzalez, R)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER DENYING 85 Motion to Join as Co-Plaintiff and DIRECTING Clerk's Office to Serve Courtesy Copy of Order on Inmate George Hamilton, CDC# K-54885, at Kern Valley State Prison, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/17/2013. (Marrujo, C)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER ADOPTING 72 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; ORDERED that Defendant shall provide Plaintiff with a Kosher Diet during the eight-day period of the Spring 2014 Yahweh Passover Feast of Unleavened Bread, the dates of which as defined by House of Yahweh, will expire after the conclusion of 2014 Feast, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 09/05/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/22/2013, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days.(Marrujo, C)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/18/2013 adopting 64 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and dismissing certain claims and defendants.(Lundstrom, T)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants re 61 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/9/13. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Fourteen Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 43 Motion to Excuse Late Filing of Opposition Nunc Pro Tunc; ORDER Denying Defendant's 39 Motion to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Defendant's Opposition signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 02/26/2013. (Flores, E)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Consolidating Civil Case No. 1:11-cv-02106-MJS With Related And Previously Filed Civil Case No. 1:10-cv-01500-LJO-DLB (ECF No. 1 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/25/2012. (Fahrney, E)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 41 Motion for Leave to Amend; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 47 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/27/2012. Amended Complaint due by 10/1/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Denying Motion for Appointment of Counsel 32 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/16/12. (Gonzalez, R)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 26 Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Request for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction, Nunc Pro Tunc, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/8/12. (Gonzalez, R)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's First Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading and Setting Deadline to Respond to Motion for Preliminary Injunction 7 and 19 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 01/20/2012. (Case Management Deadline: 1/30/2012) (Martin-Gill, S)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying 17 Request for Entry of Default, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/20/11. (Verduzco, M)
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Dismissing Certain Claims signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 09/23/2011. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Wegman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Ellis Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherylee Wegman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Slavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reba Grissom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Arlitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?