Sosa v. Sunny I Nishimoto et al
Plaintiff: Jesus Sosa
Defendant: Sunny I Nishimoto, Dorothy Nishimoto and Nishimoto Company Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv01577
Filed: August 31, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/20/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 17 Defendants' Motion to Set Aside the Entry of Default be GRANTED. Objections to F&R due within fifteen (15) days of service of this recommendation. Matter referred to Judge Wanger; signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/5/2011. (Timken, A)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT re 17 MOTION to SET ASIDE: 1) Defendants shall file a supplemental statement regarding their asserted meritorious defense in support of the motion to set aside the clerks' entry of default on or before 3/16/201 1; 2) Plaintiff may file an optional statement in response to Defendants' statement on or before 3/24/2011; and 3) The 3/16/2011, hearing is VACATED and RESET to 4/6/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/9/2011. (Timken, A)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER regarding 17 Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default. Defendants' Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default is RESET to 3/16/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Plaintiff shall file an opposition or statement of non-opposition on or before 2/23/2011; and Defendants may file an optional reply brief on or before 3/2/2011. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/8/2011. (Timken, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sosa v. Sunny I Nishimoto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Sosa
Represented By: Tanya Levinson Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunny I Nishimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Nishimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nishimoto Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?