Quinn v. Fresno County Sheriff et al
Plaintiff: James Loran Quinn
Defendant: Fresno County Sheriff, Fresno County Probation Department, David Alanis, Leonard Richert, Fresno County District Attorney, Fresno County Jail, Fresno Police Department and County of Fresno
Case Number: 1:2010cv01617
Filed: September 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER Vacating Judgment for Clarity of the Record 198 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/19/15. (Verduzco, M)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER on Stipulated Dismissal, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/10/14: The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this action. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO EXTEND DISMISS ACTION AND TO RESOLVE POTENTIAL MEDICAL LIENS (Docs. 230, 231) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 22, 2013. (Munoz, I)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 230 AMENDED 229 Order After 228 Settlement, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/15/2013. Notice to Dismiss by 11/22/2013. (Gaumnitz, R)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER on The Parties' 211 212 Motions In Limine, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/9/2013. (Gaumnitz, R)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 213 STIPULATION TO THE ENFORCEMENT OF THE COURT'S PREVIOUS ORDER GRANTING CERTAIN OF THE PARTIES PREVIOUSLY FILED MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on September 11, 2013. (Munoz, I)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 208 FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 7, 2013. (Munoz, I)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/20/2013. (Herman, H)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 STIPULATION and ORDER Setting Settlement Conference: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE set for August 14, 2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/17/2013. (Herman, H)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER FOLLOWING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on June 14, 2013. (Munoz, I)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE for for 6/14/2013 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 29, 2013. (Munoz, I)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 JUDGMENT on the Special Verdict, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/11/13. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER on the parties' 188 190 Motions for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/8/2013. (Filing Deadline: 3/29/2013) (Figueroa, O)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER on the Parties' Post-Trial Motions (Docs. 174 , 175 ), Signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/14/2012. The parties shall file a joint proposed form of final judgment consistent with this order by no later than 12/21/2012. (Arellano, S.)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 160 SECOND DECISION ON JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND VERDICT FORM signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 9, 2012. (Munoz, I)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTIONS TO AMEND THE PRETRIAL ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 3, 2012. (Munoz, I)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO AMEND THE PRETRIAL ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 27, 2012. Response due by noon on Monday, July 30, 2012. (Munoz, I)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 (Doc. 111) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 25, 2012. (Munoz, I)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER ON THE PARTIES' MOTIONS IN LIMINE 110 111 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 20, 2012. (Munoz, I)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER on Defendants' 104 Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/10/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER on Defendant's 68 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER GRANTS the County Summary Judgment with respect to Plaintiff's Monell claim; Order DENIES Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment in all other respects, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/06/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE MOTION TO EXCEED REPLY PAGE LIMIT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 16, 2012. (Munoz, I)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING 48 HOUR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 7, 2012. (Munoz, I)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Amending the Scheduling Order to Extend Time For Expert Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/9/2012. (Scheduling Orders 47 62 AMENDED as follows: The expert discovery cutoff date is extended from 4/6/2012, to 5/9/2012. No further extensions of the expert discovery cut-off will be granted. Counsel for both parties are expected to meet and confer regarding a proposed date to complete thedeposition of Plaintiffs non-retained expert witness Dr. Lorie Decarvalho within this time frame.) (Gaumnitz, R)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION and ORDER Amending The Scheduling Order to Exten the Time for Expert Discovery, Designation of Expert Witnesses and Rule 26 Reports: (1) The date for designating expert witnesses, and production of their Rule 26 expert reports is extended from 3/9/12 to March 14, 2012; (2) The expert discovery cutoff date is extened from 3/9/12 to April 6, 2012; (3) Defendants' ex parte application to amend the scheduling order [Doc. 60] is DENIED as moot. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/9/2012. (Herman, H)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to file their expert witness designations; said designations, including any supplemental designations, are to be served no later than 3/9/2012; order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/3/2012. (Rooney, M)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER Authorizing Limited Disclosure Confidential County of Fresno Public Health Department and Fresno County Sheriff's Department Policies, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/26/2011. (Herman, H)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION Extending Time to File Joint Scheduling Conference Report and ORDER Thereon signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/17/2011.(Joint Scheduling Conference Report Deadline: 6/21/2011) (Figueroa, O)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/1/2011. (Plaintiffs medical care claim under section 1983 against Defendant ALANIS is DISMISSED, without prejudice; Plainti ffs first cause of action is DISMISSED, with prejudice; Plaintiffs second cause of action is DISMISSED, with prejudice; Plaintiffs third cause of action is DISMISSED, without prejudice; Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within fourteen (14) d ays of service of the Memorandum Decision; and Defendants shall file a response within ten (10) days of service of the amended complaint. On May 20, 2011, Plaintiff failed to timely file an amended complaint within 14 days of service of the Memorandum Decision, and as such, the Court hereby rules as follows: Plaintiffs third cause of action is DISMISSED, with prejudice.) (Gaumnitz, R)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/19/2011. (Plaintiffs medical care claim under section 1983 against Defendant ALANIS is DISMISSED, without prejudice; Plaint iffs first cause of action is DISMISSED, with prejudice; Plaintiffs second cause of action is DISMISSED, with prejudice; Plaintiffs third cause of action is DISMISSED, without prejudice; Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within fourteen (14) days of service of the Memorandum Decision; and Defendants shall file a response within ten (10) days of service of the amended complaint.)(Gaumnitz, R)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM DECISION REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS 30 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/5/2011. ( IT IS ORDERED: 1) Plaintiffs medical care claim under Section 1983 (thirteenth cause of action) against Defendant Alanis isDISMISSED WITHOUT PRE JUDICE; 2)Plaintiffs first cause of action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 3)Plaintiffs second cause of action is DISMISSED WITHPREJUDICE; 4)Plaintiffs third cause of action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 5) Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint wi thin fourteen (14) days of electronic service of this Memorandum Decision; Defendants shall file a esponse within ten (10) days of service of the amended complaint, and 6) Defendants shall submit a form of order consistent with this Memorandum Decision within five (5) days of electronic service of this decision.)(Gaumnitz, R)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Corrected Second Amended Complaint, Signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/3/2011. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within fourteen (14) days of service of this order. Defendants shall file a response within ten (10) days of service of the amended complaint. (Arellano, S.)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION Extending Time to File Third Amended Complaint to March 7th and ORDER Thereon signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/17/2011. (Amended Complaint due by 3/7/2011; Defendants will file their response within ten (10) days of service of the amended document) (Figueroa, O)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM, DECISION regarding Motion to Dismiss 10 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/8/2011. (Kusamura, W)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinn v. Fresno County Sheriff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Loran Quinn
Represented By: David M. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno County Probation Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Alanis
Represented By: James J. Arendt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Richert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno County District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Fresno
Represented By: James J. Arendt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?