October 3, 2016 |
Filing
215
ORDER GRANTING 213 Plaintiff's Motion for Copy of Docket and ORDER EXTENDING Deadline to Object to the Findings and Recommendations to 11/3/2016 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/3/2016. (Jessen, A)
|
September 22, 2016 |
Filing
212
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant Defendants' 196 Motion for Terminating Sanctions signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 09/22/2016. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 10/25/2016. (Flores, E)
|
September 14, 2016 |
Filing
211
ORDER adopting 187 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 174 Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/13/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
|
July 27, 2016 |
Filing
210
ORDER ADOPTING 180 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER GRANTING 162 Defendant Goss' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; and ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Goss signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/26/2016. (Jessen, A)
|
June 21, 2016 |
Filing
208
ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Clarify the Order Staying Discovery and Deadlines Pending Ruling on Defendants' Motion for Court Intervention, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/21/16. (Marrujo, C)
|
May 23, 2016 |
Filing
199
ORDER GRANTING 198 Defendants' Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and Staying Discovery and Deadlines Pending Ruling on Defendants' Motion for Court Intervention signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/20/2016. (Jessen, A)
|
April 13, 2016 |
Filing
190
ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 163 & 171 Motions to Compel; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 170 Motion for Protective Order; ORDER MODIFYING the Discovery and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/12/16. Discovery due by 6/30/2016; Dispositive Motions filed by 8/30/2016. (Marrujo, C)
|
April 7, 2016 |
Filing
187
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Deny Plaintiff's Motion to File a Supplement to the Third Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/7/2016. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
|
April 5, 2016 |
Filing
186
ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 167 Motion for Court Intervention and DISCHARGING 168 Order to Show Cause, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/5/16. (Marrujo, C)
|
March 18, 2016 |
Filing
181
ORDER Striking Plaintiff's 179 Supplemental Argument in Opposition to Defendant Goss' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 03/17/2016. (Flores, E)
|
February 18, 2016 |
Filing
168
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action Should Not Be Dismissed With Prejudice Because of Plaintiff's Sexual Harassment of Defense Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/17/2016. Show Cause Response due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
|
January 12, 2016 |
Filing
160
ORDER Granting Defendants' Request To Take Plaintiff's Deposition Via Video Conference (Doc. 159 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/12/2016. (Fahrney, E)
|
August 3, 2015 |
Filing
156
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 154 Motion for Stay in Proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 08/03/2015. (Flores, E)
|
June 1, 2015 |
Filing
147
ORDER ADOPTING 135 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING Plaintiff's 121 Motion to File a Supplement to the Third Amended Complaint, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/1/2015. (Marrujo, C)
|
May 13, 2015 |
Filing
142
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Requests for Review/Reconsideration of Rulings 129 , 130 , 131 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/13/15. (Gonzalez, R)
|
May 12, 2015 |
Filing
141
ORDER Denying 128 Plaintiff's Request for Review/Reconsideration Per Fed R.Civ.P 60(b)(1), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/12/15. (Gonzalez, R)
|
May 4, 2015 |
Filing
140
ORDER WITHDRAWING Order Adopting Findings And Recommendations Granting Defendant Byers' Motion To Dismiss And DISREGARDING Defendant Langler's Motion To Dismiss As Moot (Docs. 109 , 132 , 139 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/4/2015. (Fahrney, E)
|
May 1, 2015 |
Filing
139
ORDER Adopting Findings And Recommendations And Granting Defendant Byers' Motion To Dismiss And Disregarding Defendant Langler's Motion To Dismiss As Moot (Docs. 109 , 132 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/29/2015. (Fahrney, E)
|
April 14, 2015 |
Filing
137
ORDER Disregarding Plaintiff's Motion For Status On His Motion To Supplement The Complaint And On Defendants' Motion To Dismiss (Doc. 134 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/14/2015. (Fahrney, E)
|
April 7, 2015 |
Filing
135
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Plaintiff's 121 Motion to File a Supplement to the Third Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 04/07/2015. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 5/11/2015. (Flores, E)
|
March 18, 2015 |
Filing
133
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of and Examination By An Expert Witness 118 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/18/15. (Hellings, J)
|
January 5, 2015 |
Filing
126
ORDER ADOPTING 114 SECOND AMENDED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL; ORDER STRIKING 108 Findings and Recommendations, 113 Amended Findings and Recommendations; ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 69 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER DENYING 88 Motion to Strike; and ORDER DENYING 94 Plaintiff's Motion for Additional Discovery signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/31/2014. Defendant Gallagher is dismissed from this action. (Jessen, A)
|
November 19, 2014 |
Filing
114
SECOND AMENDED FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATION To GRANT IN PART AND DENY IN PART Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment And Denying Defendants' Motion To Strike Plaintiff's Opposition(Docs. 69 , 88 , 90 , 94 ), Objections Due Within 30 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/19/2014. F&R's referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 12/22/2014. (Fahrney, E)
|
October 31, 2014 |
Filing
110
SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER-Notice And Warning Of Requirements For Opposing Defendants' Motion To Dismiss (Doc. 109 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/30/2014. (Opposition/Non-Opposition Deadline: 11/25/2014) (Fahrney, E)
|
October 17, 2014 |
Filing
108
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT IN PART AND DENY IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT and DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION re 69 , 88 , 90 , 94 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/16/2014. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 11/20/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
|
October 14, 2014 |
Filing
107
ORDER striking 106 SUR-REPLY signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/14/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
|
September 23, 2014 |
Filing
97
ORDER Granting Defendant T. Byers' First Motion To Extend Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/23/2014. (Fahrney, E)
|
August 20, 2014 |
Filing
86
ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY re 79 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/20/2014. (Jessen, A)
|
August 19, 2014 |
Filing
84
ORDER GRANTING 71 Plaintiff's Motion for Copies of Orders From This Court signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/19/2014. (Jessen, A)
|
August 13, 2014 |
Filing
77
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's First Motion To Extend Time To File Opposition And Granting His Requests For Return Of Exhibits (Docs. 73 , 74 , 75 ), 21-Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/12/2014.(Opposition Deadline: 9/5/2014) (Fahrney, E)
|
August 12, 2014 |
Filing
76
ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Doc. 72 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/12/2014. (Fahrney, E)
|
July 9, 2014 |
Filing
67
ORDER Dircting Clerk's Office to Send Plaintiff a Copy of Letter from Warden Holland 66 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/9/14. (Verduzco, M)
|
May 22, 2014 |
Filing
62
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motions for Copies of Orders From This Court 54 , 59 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/22/14. (Hellings, J)
|
January 23, 2014 |
Filing
52
ORDER on Plaintiff's 49 Objections to Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/23/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
|
January 7, 2014 |
Filing
47
ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS (Doc. 42 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/7/2014. (Fahrney, E)
|
November 18, 2013 |
Filing
42
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/18/2013 vacating 33 ORDER finding service of certain claims appropriate and directing the clerk of court to provide Plaintiff with service documents and withdrawing FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing certain claims and FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing certain claims re 31 Third Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 12/23/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
|
November 7, 2013 |
Filing
41
ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Doc. 38 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/7/2013. (Fahrney, E)
|
July 31, 2013 |
Filing
26
ORDER ADOPTING 25 Findings and Recommendations to Dismiss Certain Claims, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/30/2013. (Marrujo, C)
|
March 26, 2013 |
Filing
21
ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a Second Amended Complaint or notify the Court of his willingness to proceed only on his cognizable claim signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/26/2013. (Filing Deadline: 4/19/2013).(Lundstrom, T)
|
February 21, 2013 |
Filing
19
ORDER WITHDRAWING the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Issued February 13, 2013 17 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/21/13. (Hellings, J)
|
February 13, 2013 |
Filing
17
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Plaintiff's 1 Complaint for Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Comply with the Court's Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/12/2013. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 3/4/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
|
December 13, 2012 |
Filing
14
ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT for Violation of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/13/2012. First Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
|
October 29, 2010 |
Filing
8
ORDER GRANTING 7 Plaintiff's Motion for Information signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/29/2010. (Jessen, A)
|
October 5, 2010 |
Filing
6
ORDER Denying 3 Motion to Appointment of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/5/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|