Everett v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Trina Everett
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2010cv01831
Filed: October 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS regarding Plaintiff's 1 Social Security Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/30/2012. Matter referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 6/15/2012. (Figueroa, O)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to File Reply Brief, document 32 ; said brief is now due on or before 1/10/2012; order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/4/2012. (Rooney, M)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER fro Second Extension of Time to File Defendant's Responsive Brief: Defendant's Responsive Brief extended from 11/16/11 to 12/16/2011. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/22/2011. (Herman, H)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Opening Brief by 11/16/2011. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/21/2011. (Herman, H)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING request for extension of time. Plaintiff shall file an opening brief on or before September 12, 2011; The Commissioner shall file a responsive brief on or before October 17, 2011; and Plaintiff may file a reply brief on or before November 4, 2011. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/1/2011. (Timken, A)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER to extend time 15 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/31/2011. (Timken, A)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER for extension of time to submit Plaintiff's confidential brief signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/16/2011. (Timken, A)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/5/2010. (Bradley, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Everett v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina Everett
Represented By: Sengthiene Bosavanh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?