Telles v. Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Henry William Telles
Defendant: Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department and Board of Supervisors for Stanislaus County
Case Number: 1:2010cv01911
Filed: October 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that This Action be Dismissed signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/24/2011. Objections to F&R due by 6/9/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Discharging 14 Order to Show Cause, ORDER Withdrawing 15 Findings and Recommendations, ORDER Granting 16 Motion for Extension, and ORDER Directing Clerk to Reserve signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/5/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending To Dismiss the Action signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/30/2011. Objections to F&R due by 4/13/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action Should not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/14/2011. Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause in as described in this order within 14 days. (Arellano, S.)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/17/2011. Amended Complaint due by 3/10/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action should not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/24/2011. Show Cause Response due by 2/7/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/28/2011. Amended Complaint due by 1/18/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis 2 4 , and ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/24/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Amended MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERISsigned by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/2/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Telles v. Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry William Telles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Supervisors for Stanislaus County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?