Garrison Johnson v. Cate et al
Plaintiff: Garrison S. Johnson
Defendant: Matthew Cate and Kelly Harrington
Case Number: 1:2010cv01918
Filed: October 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Denying Motion For Reconsideration (ECF No. 71 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/17/2015. (Fahrney, E)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Action Be Dismissed for Failure to State a Claim 58 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/6/14: Thirty-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/2/14. 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motions As Moot (ECF Nos. 46 , 49 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/25/2014. (Fahrney, E)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING 37 Motion to Appoint Counsel and ORDER DENYING 38 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/19/2012. (Jessen, A)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Action be Dismissed for Failure to State a Claim re 25 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/10/12. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections, If Any, Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Regarding Defendants' Motion for Clarification 26 ; ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motion Concerning his Legal Mail 28 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/16/12. (Verduzco, M)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Document # 27 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/16/2012. (Fahrney, E)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be Granted 18 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/17/11. Referred to Judge O'Neill. (Verduzco, M)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and REQUIRING Plaintiff to Pay the $350.00 Filing Fee In Full Within 21 Days, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/21/2010. Filing Fee due by 11/15/2010. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrison Johnson v. Cate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrison S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?